YASHARA'L v. CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE LOAN
Plaintiff: MOWRIYAH ABIYAH YASHARA'L
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE LOAN
Case Number: 5:2019cv00471
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Yashara'l failed to pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. By January 27, 2020, the Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause why the Court should not dismiss her case for failure to pay the filing fee. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/13/2020. (kat)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned - Notice of Deficiency, sent to Mowriyah Abiyah Yashara'l returned as undeliverable. (deb)
December 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by MOWRIYAH ABIYAH YASHARA'L ); You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form is enclosed. (vs)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MOWRIYAH ABIYAH YASHARA'L (vs)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE LOAN,filed by MOWRIYAH ABIYAH YASHARA'L. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YASHARA'L v. CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE LOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOWRIYAH ABIYAH YASHARA'L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE LOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?