CUTLER v. WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: CUTLER BENJAMIN, III and BENJAMIN CUTLER, III
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY JAIL, WARNER ROBBINS POLICE DEPARTMENT, DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, HOUSTON COUNTY, RUTHERFORD, HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA, ALAN BRETT ROZIER and LUDERMAKER
Case Number: 5:2019cv00511
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #7 Motion; denying #8 Motion; denying 9 Motion; denying #11 Motion as premature. ORDER to Recast Complaint re #1 Complaint filed by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III. Plaintiff shall have TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this order to (1) submit a recast complaint as directed and (2) either pay the Courts $400 filing fee or submit a revised and properly completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 1/21/2020. (ggs)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 EX PARTE MOTION, MOTION Dispositive Motion Filed by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Incident Report, #2 Terroristic threats and acts, #3 Envelope) *** Restricted document to case participants due to personal identifiers contained therein.Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBIT(S) by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 5:19-cv-511. Member Case # 5:19cv514. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 1/17/2020. (ggs)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Dispositive Motion 2 Filed by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Dispositive Motion 1 Filed by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CUTLER BENJAMIN, III (cma)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (cma)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT(S) by BENJAMIN CUTLER, III re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, HOUSTON COUNTY, HOUSTON COUNTY JAIL, WARNER ROBBINS POLICE DEPARTMENT filed by CUTLER BENJAMIN, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUTLER v. WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUTLER BENJAMIN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN CUTLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER ROBBINS POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTHERFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN BRETT ROZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUDERMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?