BETHUNE v. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: STACY BETHUNE
Defendant: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY and AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2020cv00022
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY Attorney AARON EDWARD POHLMANN added to party HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft) (POHLMANN, AARON)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ELIZABETH J BONDURANT on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY (BONDURANT, ELIZABETH)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 Complaint against HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY by STACY BETHUNE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PYLES, BRADLEY)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 3/6/2020. Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company shall have 14 days from Plaintiff's filing to respond to the Amended Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 3/2/2020. (ech)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by STACY BETHUNE filed by BRADLEY G PYLES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PYLES, BRADLEY)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to STACY BETHUNE (vs)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3364184, $400 filed by STACY BETHUNE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PYLES, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BETHUNE v. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ELIZABETH J BONDURANT
Represented By: AARON EDWARD POHLMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY BETHUNE
Represented By: BRADLEY G PYLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?