CONKEL et al v. WILKERSON et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CONKEL and RISSA KILAR
Defendant: CHARLES WILKERSON and WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS
Case Number: 5:2020cv00045
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 9/28/2020. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 10/28/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/1/2020. (kat)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS (WILLIAMS, JOSEPH)
March 4, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS dba GRAY ATA KARATE FOR KIDS, INC.); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (cma)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 4/2/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS with Jury Demand.(WILLIAMS, JOSEPH)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by CHARLES WILKERSON with Jury Demand.(WILLIAMS, JOSEPH)Attorney JOSEPH E WILLIAMS, III added to party CHARLES WILKERSON(pty:dft), Attorney JOSEPH E WILLIAMS, III added to party WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS(pty:dft)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS. (ans)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHARLES WILKERSON. (ans)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TIMOTHY CONKEL (ans)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3381393, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KASPERS, TYLER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONKEL et al v. WILKERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WILKERSON
Represented By: JOSEPH E WILLIAMS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILKERSONS ATA MARTIAL ARTS
Represented By: JOSEPH E WILLIAMS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CONKEL
Represented By: TYLER BRAND KASPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RISSA KILAR
Represented By: TYLER BRAND KASPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?