BOGATSCHOW v. CF MEDICAL LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROMAN BOGATSCHOW
Defendant: CF MEDICAL LLC, MITCHELL D. BLUHM & ASSOCIATES, LLC and MITCHELL D BLUHM AND ASSOCIATES LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00059
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROMAN BOGATSCHOW. as to CF MEDICAL LLC (CARLSON, CLIFFORD)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROMAN BOGATSCHOW. as to MITCHELL D BLUHM AND ASSOCIATES LLC (CARLSON, CLIFFORD)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CF MEDICAL LLC, MITCHELL D BLUHM AND ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons CF Medical LLC)(tam)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ROMAN BOGATSCHOW (tam)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3392047, $400 filed by ROMAN BOGATSCHOW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - February 20, 2019 Dunning Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons as to MBA, #4 Summons as to CF Medical)(CARLSON, CLIFFORD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOGATSCHOW v. CF MEDICAL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL D. BLUHM & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL D BLUHM AND ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROMAN BOGATSCHOW
Represented By: CLIFFORD ALVA PHILLIP CARLSON
Represented By: RONALD E DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?