RADFORD v. I C SYSTEMS INC
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA RADFORD
Defendant: I C SYSTEMS INC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00060
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement I.C. Systems, Inc by CYNTHIA RADFORD (BERRY, MATTHEW)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL CHRIS ARMOR - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE interested parties by CYNTHIA RADFORD (BERRY, MATTHEW)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to I C SYSTEMS INC. (vs)
March 30, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Summons Returned Executed filed by CYNTHIA RADFORD ); After the civil case has been opened electronically, completed Civil Summons should be submitted by email to macon.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. The summons will be issued and e-filed by the court. Attorneys of record will receive CM/ECF notice that the issued summons is available. (vs)
March 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CYNTHIA RADFORD as to I C SYSTEMS INC. (BERRY, MATTHEW)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CYNTHIA RADFORD (vs)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I.C. SYSTEMS INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3392285, $400 filed by CYNTHIA RADFORD (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERRY, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RADFORD v. I C SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA RADFORD
Represented By: MATTHEW THOMAS BERRY
Represented By: CHRIS ARMOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I C SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?