BARRON v. MARSH et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM EARNEST BARRON, JR
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER WILDER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JONES and CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MARSH
Case Number: 5:2020cv00095
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by WILLIAM EARNEST BARRON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(cma)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by WILLIAM EARNEST BARRON, JR. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 21 DAYS from the date shown on this Order to either submit the required $400.00 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with a certified copy of his trust fund account statement for the last six months. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward a blank motion to proceed without prepayment of fees, along with the appropriate account certification form and a copy of this order (all showing the civil action number) to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 03/25/2020. (cma)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WILLIAM EARNEST BARRON, JR (vs)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JONES, MARSH, WILDER,filed by WILLIAM EARNEST BARRON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARRON v. MARSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER WILDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM EARNEST BARRON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?