OSIRUS v. BIG LOTS STORES INC et al
Plaintiff: REGINA OSIRUS
Defendant: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, BIG LOTS STORES INC and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 5:2020cv00288
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 9/10/2020. (kat)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by REGINA OSIRUS as to CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY(WILBURN, MONICA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by REGINA OSIRUS filed by MONICA LYNNE WILBURN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order)(WILBURN, MONICA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 2/21/2021. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 3/23/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 9/4/2020. (kat)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/11/2020. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's counsel SHALL show cause by 8/7/2020 why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure to update her contact information via PACER. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 7/31/2020. (kat)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by BIG LOTS STORES INC with Jury Demand.(LUSKIN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by BIG LOTS STORES INC (LUSKIN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIG LOTS STORES INC (LUSKIN, ROBERT)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by BIG LOTS STORES INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required corporate disclosure statement and jurisdictional statement immediately.(ggs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BIG LOTS STORES INC. (ggs)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by BIG LOTS STORES INC ); Notice to Counsel - MONICA LYNNE WILBURN - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(ggs)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against REGINA OSIRUS Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3516539, $400 filed by BIG LOTS STORES INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(NOBLE, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSIRUS v. BIG LOTS STORES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG LOTS STORES INC
Represented By: ROBERT E NOBLE, III
Represented By: ROBERT A LUSKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA OSIRUS
Represented By: Monica Lynne Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?