OWENS v. SPRAYBERRY et al
Petitioner: JAMES OWENS, III
Respondent: WARDEN KEVIN SPRAYBERRY and HAYS STATE PRISON
Case Number: 5:2020cv00315
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
August 19, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES. (vs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00178. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
August 19, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC GA @ Macon Division. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Owens, III re #5 Order. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, the Macon Division, along with along with all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings and exhibits (if any) filed herein. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/19/20. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Owens, III re #4 Notice (Other). (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction: Judge AT terminated from case; Judge HLM added to case. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Owens, III re #3 Order. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Owens, III. (bjh) [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Owens, III. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Envelope)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. SPRAYBERRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES OWENS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN KEVIN SPRAYBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HAYS STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?