RICHARDSON v. MACON BIBB COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: Christopher R Richardson and CHRISTOPHER RAYSHAWN RICHARDSON
Defendant: SHERIFF DAVID DAVIS, MACON BIBB COUNTY, MACON BIBB SHERIFF'S OFFICE and MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Case Number: 5:2020cv00322
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 7/13/2021. Dispositive motions due by 8/12/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/13/2020. (vs)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/13/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by DAVID DAVIS, MACON BIBB SHERIFF'S OFFICE with Jury Demand.(LEWIS, DAWN)Attorney DAWN M LEWIS added to party DAVID DAVIS(pty:dft), Attorney DAWN M LEWIS added to party MACON BIBB SHERIFF'S OFFICE(pty:dft)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MACON BIBB COUNTY, MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS with Jury Demand.(GORDON, CHRISTOPHER)Attorney CHRISTOPHER GORDON added to party MACON BIBB COUNTY(pty:dft), Attorney CHRISTOPHER GORDON added to party MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS(pty:dft)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by CHRISTOPHER RAYSHAWN RICHARDSON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(GOMEZ, DEBRA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER RAYSHAWN RICHARDSON (vs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DAVID DAVIS, MACON BIBB COUNTY, MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, MACON BIBB SHERIFF'S OFFICE. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robert Reichert, Mayor, #2 Summons Duke Groover, County Attorney, #3 Summons David Davis, Sheriff)(vs)
August 18, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER RAYSHAWN RICHARDSON ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed using the event COMPLAINT (IFP).(vs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3541900, $400 filed by Christopher R Richardson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(GOMEZ, DEBRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON v. MACON BIBB COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF DAVID DAVIS
Represented By: VIRGIL LOUIS ADAMS
Represented By: LAUREN M CHILDS
Represented By: DAWN M LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON BIBB COUNTY
Represented By: DUKE R GROOVER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER GORDON
Represented By: LAUREN N SCHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON BIBB SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: VIRGIL LOUIS ADAMS
Represented By: LAUREN M CHILDS
Represented By: DAWN M LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: DUKE R GROOVER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER GORDON
Represented By: LAUREN N SCHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R Richardson
Represented By: DEBRA G GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER RAYSHAWN RICHARDSON
Represented By: DEBRA G GOMEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?