THORNTON v. TELFAIR STATE PRISON et al
Plaintiff: RODNEY JEROME THORNTON
Defendant: TELFAIR STATE PRISON and GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2020cv00324
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE copy of complaint by RODNEY JEROME THORNTON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: for Plaintiff to answer the questions on pages two through four, sign, and return the complaint to this Court. The CLERK is therefore DIRECTED to enclose a copy of Plaintiffs complaintwith this Order. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 09/23/2020. (vs)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Rodney Thornton regarding Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to RODNEY JEROME THORNTON (vs)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by RODNEY JEROME THORNTON. (Attachments: #1 Account Certification). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TELFAIR STATE PRISON,filed by RODNEY JEROME THORNTON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THORNTON v. TELFAIR STATE PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELFAIR STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY JEROME THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?