SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC v. UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. and SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC
Defendant: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2020cv00363
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Discovery Status Report by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(WOLAK, JENNIFER)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Discovery Order Memorandum(tam)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be complete by 8/15/2021. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 9/14/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 3/2/2021. (wbm)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Scheduling/Discovery Order, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed by CAITLIN MATTLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12. Scheduling and Discovery Order dated 11.17.2020)(MATTLER, CAITLIN)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 5/15/2021. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 6/14/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/17/2020. (kat)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint/Petition, by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint/Petition, filed by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC.(WOLAK, JENNIFER)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint)(CASH, BLAIR)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 11/16/2020. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER to Amend Complaint: Plaintiff shall file no later than October 27 an amended complaint to amend only the basis for subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/13/2020. (kat)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE Filing - Certificate of Interested Persons by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (WOLAK, JENNIFER)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent MARKEL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent STATE NATIONAL COMPANIES INC for UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (WOLAK, JENNIFER)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(WOLAK, JENNIFER)Attorney JENNIFER WOLAK added to party UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC as to UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (CASH, BLAIR)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC identifying Corporate Parent SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INC for SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. (CASH, BLAIR)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (tam)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC ); Notice to Counsel - (MEGAN MARIE EARLY SOPPA) Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(tam)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # GAMDC-3566349, $400 filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint - Winicki Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint - Master Trans. Svc. Agreement, #5 Exhibit C to Complaint - Denial of Tender)(CASH, BLAIR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC v. UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: BLAIR JOSEPH CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC
Represented By: BLAIR JOSEPH CASH
Represented By: MEGAN MARIE EARLY SOPPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CAITLIN MATTLER
Represented By: JENNIFER WOLAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?