BARNES v. NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC
Plaintiff: Mark A Barnes
Defendant: Nationwide Retirement Solutions, Inc. and NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00102
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/4/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC identifying Corporate Parent NFS Distributors, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Corporation for NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC. (LEMPOGO, DEBORAH)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC. Related document: #2 Supplement to Complaint filed by MARK A BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deferred Compensation Plan for Public Employees, #2 Exhibit B - Rev. Proc. 2019-9)(LEMPOGO, DEBORAH)Attorney DEBORAH F LEMPOGO added to party NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC(pty:dft) Modified on 4/19/2021 to edit docket text(vs).
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC. (vs)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBIT - Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint against All Parties by Mark A Barnes (BARNES, MARK) Modified on 3/29/2021 to edit docket text (vs).
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark A Barnes Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3751942, $402 filed by Mark A Barnes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(BARNES, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES v. NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Barnes
Represented By: MARK A BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Retirement Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: DEBORAH F LEMPOGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?