KENNEDY v. STEIN et al
Plaintiff: JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY and JOHN F KENNEDY
Defendant: Avy Stein, Christopher Boehm, Stuart Reed and CHRIS BOEHM
Case Number: 5:2021cv00106
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 18 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CHRIS BOEHM, STUART REED, AVY STEIN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3807508, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ward Stone, Jr. - 684630. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Issued from Northern District of Illinois)(HERSH, AARON)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CHRIS BOEHM, STUART REED, AVY STEIN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3807475, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ward Stone Jr. - 684630. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Issued from Northern District of Illinois)(LETOURNEAU, BRIENNE)
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CHRIS BOEHM, STUART REED, AVY STEIN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3807426, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ward Stone Jr. - 684630. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing issued from Northern District of Illinois)(MARTIN, CRAIG)
May 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by STUART REED, AVY STEIN, CHRIS BOEHM, #12 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by STUART REED, AVY STEIN, CHRIS BOEHM, #13 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by STUART REED, AVY STEIN, CHRIS BOEHM ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. Please see admission instructions located at https://www.gamd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions.(mdm)
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file a brief in support of its pending motion to dismiss not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiff may likewise take up to 25 pages in his response. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/27/2021 (TES)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 ***ERROR IN FILING - DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED BY PETITIONING ATTORNEY*** PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Defendants Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3806540, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ward Stone 684630. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Craig Martin Cert of GS)(STONE, WARD) Modified on 5/28/2021 (mdm).
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 ***ERROR IN FILING - DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED BY PETITIONING ATTORNEY*** PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Defendants Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3806536, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ward Stone 684630. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Brienne Letourneau Cert of GS)(STONE, WARD) Modified on 5/28/2021 (mdm).
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 ***ERROR IN FILING - DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED BY PETITIONING ATTORNEY*** PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Defendants Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3806523, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ward Stone 684630. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Aaron Hersh Cert of GS)(STONE, WARD) Modified on 5/28/2021 (mdm).
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by CHRIS BOEHM, STUART REED, AVY STEIN filed by WARD STONE, JR.(STONE, WARD)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN F KENNEDY. as to CHRIS BOEHM, STUART REED, AVY STEIN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waiver of Avy Stein, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Waiver of Chris Boehm, #3 Exhibit C - Executed Waiver of Stuart Reed)(BANTER, JAMES)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RONALD J SCHUTZ, VALERIE ANNE STACEY (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission) (nop)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOHN F KENNEDY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3756199, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James Banter 581797. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SCHUTZ, RONALD)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOHN F KENNEDY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3756187, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James Banter - 581797. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(STACEY, VALERIE)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL COLLYARD, PETER IHRIG, THOMAS BERNDT (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission, #2 PHV Admission) (nop)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CHRIS BOEHM, STUART REED, AVY STEIN. (Attachments: #1 Summons Chris Boehm, #2 Summons Stuart Reed)(vs)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3755883, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James F. Banter, 581797. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(BERNDT, THOMAS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3755843, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James Banter - 581797. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(IHRIG, PETER)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3755805, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James Banter - 581797. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(COLLYARD, MICHAEL)
April 1, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RONALD J SHUTZ, VALERIE ANNE STACEY - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(vs)
April 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JOHN F KENNEDY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(vs)
April 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JOHN F KENNEDY ); All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. NO NEED TO REFILE.(vs)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3755138, $402 filed by JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Avy Stein, #3 Summons Summons - Chris Boehm, #4 Summons Summons - Stuart Reed)(BANTER, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. STEIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FLANDERS KENNEDY
Represented By: JAMES F BANTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F KENNEDY
Represented By: JAMES F BANTER
Represented By: THOMAS BERNDT
Represented By: PETER IHRIG
Represented By: Jo Lanier Meeks
Represented By: ADAM JOSEPH WITTENSTEIN
Represented By: RONALD J SCHUTZ
Represented By: VALERIE ANNE STACEY
Represented By: MICHAEL COLLYARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avy Stein
Represented By: CRAIG C MARTIN
Represented By: WARD STONE, JR
Represented By: BRIENNE LETOURNEAU
Represented By: AARON J HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Reed
Represented By: CRAIG C MARTIN
Represented By: WARD STONE, JR
Represented By: BRIENNE LETOURNEAU
Represented By: AARON J HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS BOEHM
Represented By: CRAIG C MARTIN
Represented By: WARD STONE, JR
Represented By: BRIENNE LETOURNEAU
Represented By: AARON J HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?