GWARA v. B&G EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Plaintiff: AMY GWARA
Defendant: B&G EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2021cv00111
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT (ggs)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Settlement Approval. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 5/14/2021. (ech)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Settlement Approval and Dismissal with Prejudice by AMY GWARA filed by DONALD W BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Donald W. Benson, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BENSON, DONALD)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&G EQUIPMENT COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3757232, $402 filed by AMY GWARA (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BENSON, DONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GWARA v. B&G EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY GWARA
Represented By: DONALD W BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?