MCCORD v. BETH YAH MINISTRIES et al
Plaintiff: TAX COMMISSIONER SAMUEL WADE MCCORD Macon-Bibb County doing business as MACON BIBB CO TAX COLLECTOR
Defendant: BETH YAH MINISTRIES and REAL ESTATE
3Rd Party Defendant: JEFFREY ALLEN and YISRA
Case Number: 5:2021cv00136
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT (vs)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/21/2021. (kat)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE / ORDER TO RETAIN COUNSEL / ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT NOTICE OF REMOVAL. The defendants are ORDERED to show cause by May 13, 2021 why their removal should not be dismissed for failure to pay the filing fee. Beth Yah Ministries is ORDERED to retain counsel and pay the filing fee by May 13, 2021. The defendants are ORDERED to supplement their notice of removal by May 13, 2021 to state the basis of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/3/2021. (kat)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 EX PARTE MOTION, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by JEFFREY ALLEN.(vs)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus Filed by JEFFREY ALLEN.(vs)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JEFFREY ALLEN,filed by JEFFREY ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Bibb County Superior Court request for corrected documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - Instructions for Release funds from escrow, #4 Exhibit 3 - State of Georgia As Valorem Tax Statement, #5 Exhibit 4 - State of Georgia As Valorem Tax Statement, #6 Exhibit 5 - State of Georgia As Valorem Tax Statement, #7 Exhibit 6 - State of Georgia As Valorem Tax Statement, #8 Exhibit 7 - State of Georgia As Valorem Tax Statement, #9 Exhibit 8 - Second Amended Notice of Hearing, #10 Exhibit 9 - Motion to Moot all pleadings, #11 Exhibit 10 - Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, #12 Exhibit 11 - Affidavit of S. Elizabeth Hall, #13 Exhibit 12 - Order, #14 Exhibit A - Certified mail, USPS tracking, #15 Exhibit B - Notice of Lis Pendens, #16 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Publication)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCORD v. BETH YAH MINISTRIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JEFFREY ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: YISRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH YAH MINISTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL ESTATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAX COMMISSIONER SAMUEL WADE MCCORD Macon-Bibb County doing business as MACON BIBB CO TAX COLLECTOR
Represented By: SUSAN ELIZABETH HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?