TAYLOR v. BROOK
Plaintiff: TERRY TAYLOR
Defendant: ANITA BROOK
Case Number: 5:2021cv00166
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern Georgia; Case Number 3:21-cv-00078. (vs)
May 18, 2021 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 6/1/2021. (vs)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/17/2021. (kat)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TERRY TAYLOR, filed by TERRY TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Probate Hearing 11/29/2018, #2 Exhibit B- Last Will and Testament, #3 Exhibit C- Hearing to Probate the Will 1/13/2020, #4 Exhibit D- Certificate of Service Notice Given to all Parties of Interest, #5 Envelope)(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. BROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANITA BROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?