LOOS v. MANN
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS H LOOS, SR
Defendant: MARK W MANN
Case Number: 5:2021cv00258
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/30/2021. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by MARK W MANN.(TERRY, CHRISTOPHER)Attorney CHRISTOPHER W TERRY added to party MARK W MANN(pty:dft)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to MARK MANN by DOUGLAS H LOOS, SR re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (DURDALLER, PAUL) Modified on 8/2/2021 to correct event and edit text. (ggs).
August 2, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Certificate of Service filed by DOUGLAS H LOOS, SR ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" - No need to refile corrected by case manager.(ggs)
July 23, 2021 Case REASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL. US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III no longer assigned to the case. (ggs)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MARK W MANN. (ggs)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark W. Mann Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3851505, $402 filed by Douglas H. Loos (Attachments: #1 Summons - Mark W. Mann, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DURDALLER, PAUL)
July 22, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Douglas H. Loos ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOOS v. MANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS H LOOS, SR
Represented By: PAUL G DURDALLER
Represented By: BRIAN JOEL LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK W MANN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER W TERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?