BROWN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: ADRAIN M BROWN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2021cv00283
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC)(tam) Modified on 8/19/2021 to correct docket text (tam).
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC, #2 USM 285 Civil Process Clerk)(tam)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 ORCC, #2 USM 285 Civil Process Clerk)(tam)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons ORCC, #2 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(tam)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 8/10/2021. (msg)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ADRAIN M BROWN (tam)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ADRAIN M BROWN filed by JOEL GRIST. (Attachments: #1 Summons to SSA/OGC; USAG; USA, #2 USM 285 to SSA/OGC; USAG; USA). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(GRIST, JOEL)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by ADRAIN M BROWN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRIST, JOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRAIN M BROWN
Represented By: JOEL GRIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?