WILLIAMS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS M. WILLIAMS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2021cv00301
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (hdw)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY - The Attorney General. (hdw)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY - Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (hdw)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (hdw)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (GLIMMERVEEN, MEGAN)
August 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. All parties having consented pursuant to 28 USC 636(c)(1) for a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct any and all proceedings in connection with this action, including but not limited to, the trial of said case and the ordering of the entry of judgment herein; this case is hereby reassigned to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE for all further proceedings. (hdw)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons ORCC)(hdw)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 The Attorney General, #2 USM 285 ORCC)(hdw)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PHYLLIS M. WILLIAMS (hdw)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (hdw)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 8/19/21. (aob)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PHYLLIS M. WILLIAMS filed by MEGAN ASHLEY GLIMMERVEEN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion, #3 Summons on Attorney General, #4 Summons on Assistant US Attorney, #5 Summons on Commissioner of Social Security, #6 USM 285 on Attorney General, #7 USM 285 on Assistant US Attorney, #8 USM 285 on Commissioner of Social Security). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(GLIMMERVEEN, MEGAN)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by PHYLLIS M. WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GLIMMERVEEN, MEGAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS M. WILLIAMS
Represented By: MEGAN ASHLEY GLIMMERVEEN
Represented By: DANIEL LEWIS WILDER
Represented By: EMMETT L GOODMAN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?