OLIVER v. NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY OLIVER and ANTHONY OLIVER RESTRICTED - CHECK FILER STATUS
Defendant: NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC, GRAY MEDIA GROUP INC, WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC, GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC, SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC, GANNETT CO INC and JOHN DOES 1-50
Case Number: 5:2021cv00361
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Filing 67 DUPLICATE FILING NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2022: #2 Envelope) (ggs).
April 18, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to the Entire Action Without Prejudice as to All Defendants by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
April 18, 2022 REMARK: In light of #66 Notice of Dismissal, this case is closed. (ggs)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Oliver is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by April 25, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice on res judicata grounds. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions including dismissal of this case and a finding of contempt. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/12/2022. (kat)
April 7, 2022 REMARK: Parties SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC, GANNETT CO INC and GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC terminated pursuant to voluntary dismissal filed at Tabs #62 , #63 , and #64 . (ggs)
April 6, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to GANNETT CO., INC. by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
April 6, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS, INC. by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
April 6, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ggs)
April 1, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE Supplemental Authority by GANNETT CO INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC re #34 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order dated 3.10.22)(BYRNSIDE, IAN)
March 30, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by SARAH T REISE on behalf of SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC(REISE, SARAH)
March 30, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RICHARD W MILLER on behalf of SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC Attorney RICHARD W MILLER added to party SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC(pty:dft)(MILLER, RICHARD)
March 1, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal GRAY MEDIA GROUP INC by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
March 1, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Defendant GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
March 1, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Defendant WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC by ANTHONY OLIVER(hdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2022: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (hdw).
March 1, 2022 REMARK: Party WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC, GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC and GRAY MEDIA GROUP INC terminated. Re: #56 , #57 , and #58 . (hdw)
February 25, 2022 Filing 55 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #46 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Disqualification shall be extended to twenty-one days after the later of: (1) the Court's order deciding the Gannett/Gatehouse motion to dismiss #14 ; (2) the Court's order deciding the Gray TV motion to dismiss #15 ; or (3) the Court's decision regarding whether to transfer venue to the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/25/2022. (kat)
February 25, 2022 Filing 54 REPLY to Response filed by ANTHONY OLIVER re #48 MOTION to tax costs against Defendant Sinclair Broadcast Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
February 22, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #46 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by GRAY MEDIA GROUP INC, SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC, WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC filed by SARAH T REISE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(REISE, SARAH)
February 15, 2022 Filing 52 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/15/22. (bwr)
February 15, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC ); Notice to Counsel Edward L. Birk. The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER.(hdw)
February 14, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GRAY MEDIA GROUP INC filed by SARAH T REISE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sentencing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - Reindictment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Jury Verdict Form, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sentencing Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - April News Report, #7 Exhibit 6 - Broadcast Reports, #8 Exhibit 7 - Composite Exhibit, #9 Exhibit 8 - Composite Exhibit)(REISE, SARAH)
February 14, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint/Petition, by GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC filed by EDWARD L BIRK.(BIRK, EDWARD)
February 14, 2022 Filing 49 RESPONSE filed by SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC re #48 MOTION to tax costs against Defendant Sinclair Broadcast Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waivers and Notice of Lawsuit)(REISE, SARAH)
February 11, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION to tax costs against Defendant Sinclair Broadcast Group Inc Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Certified Mail Card USPS Tracking Number: 7016-1970-0001-0457-6057, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service Served January 24, 2022, #3 Cover Letter)(vs)
February 11, 2022 Filing 47 WITHDRAWAL of Motion (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tam)
February 11, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION to Disqualify Defense Counsel Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tam)
February 11, 2022 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY OLIVER as to SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(vs)
February 11, 2022 Filing 44 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Certified Mail Card USPS Tracking Number: 7016-1970-0001-0457-6057, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service Served January 24, 2022, #3 Envelope)(vs)
February 9, 2022 Filing 43 WITHDRAWAL of Motion (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdw)
February 9, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw Document, Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
February 9, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION to Tax Costs Against Defendant Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certified Mail Card, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Service, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(hdw)
February 9, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #42 Motion to Withdraw Document filed by ANTHONY OLIVER ); Wrong event used. Case Administrator Deficiency.(hdw) Modified on 2/9/2022 to add docket text(hdw).
February 8, 2022 Filing 40 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File REPLY TO RESPONSE as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Service, and RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Gannett and GateHouse to file a reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss and the deadline for Gannett and GateHouse to file their response to Oliver's Motion to Disqualify are extended to and through fourteen (14) days after the date on which this Court enters an Order deciding whether to transfer this case to the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/8/2022. (kat)
February 8, 2022 Filing 39 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Hearst and Sinclair to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be extended to twenty-one days after the later of: (1) the Court's order deciding #14 Gannett/Gatehouse motion to dismiss; or (2) the Court's decision regarding whether to transfer venue to the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/8/2022. (kat)
February 8, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Service, #32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by GANNETT CO INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC filed by IAN KYLE BYRNSIDE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(BYRNSIDE, IAN)
February 4, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. by SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC, WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC filed by SARAH T REISE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(REISE, SARAH)
February 1, 2022 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY OLIVER as to SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bill, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
January 31, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE filed by ANTHONY OLIVER re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proof of Filing Fee, #2 Exhibit B: Email, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(hdw)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Oliver is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by February 18, 2022 why this case should not be transferred to the Southern District of Georgia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions including dismissal of this case and a finding of contempt. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/28/2022. (kat)
January 27, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE filed by ANTHONY OLIVER re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proof of Filign Fee Paid, #2 Exhibit B: Email, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(hdw)
January 26, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
January 24, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Application to Clerk of Entry of Default, #18 Application to Clerk of Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oliver v. Luner, Order Declaring Oliver to Be a Vexatious Litigant, #2 Exhibit Oliver v. Luner, Ninth Circuit Opinion, #3 Exhibit Oliver Sentencing Order and Inventory of Special Conditions, #4 Exhibit Email from J. Anderson to I. Byrnside)(Byrnside, Ian)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Service. Oliver's #28 requested thirty-day extension is GRANTED. Accordingly, Oliver is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss by February 21, 2022. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Defendants' #14 motion, alongwith a copy of Defendants' attachments (Docs. 14-1; 14-2; 14-3; 14-4; 14-5) to Oliver at his updated address at Augusta State Medical Prison #27 . Oliver's #28 request for electronic filing privileges is DENIED. As the Clerk of Court previously instructed, [p]risoners may not file electronically in the Middle District of Georgia[.] Finally, given Defendants' serious allegations of misconduct, the Court ORDERS Oliver to CEASE ALL ATTEMPTS TO SERVE ANY DEFENDANT UNTIL FURTHER INSTRUCTION BY THE COURT. Failure to comply with this order mayresult in sanctions including dismissal of this case and a finding of contempt. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/21/2022. (kat)
January 20, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by STEPHEN DEREK BAUER on behalf of GANNETT CO INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC Attorney STEPHEN DEREK BAUER added to party GANNETT CO INC(pty:dft), Attorney STEPHEN DEREK BAUER added to party GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC(pty:dft)(BAUER, STEPHEN)
January 20, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Service Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
January 20, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
January 18, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC re #16 MOTION for Discovery (REISE, SARAH)
January 16, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC re #15 MOTION for Service by the United States Marshal's Service Against Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Executed and filed waiver of service, #2 Exhibit B-Oliver v City of Oceanside-SD Calif, #3 Exhibit C-Oliver v Luner-CD Calif, #4 Exhibit D-Oliver v Chatham SD GA, #5 Exhibit E-Oliver v Lyft SD GA)(BIRK, EDWARD)
January 14, 2022 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC as to GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC. (BIRK, EDWARD)
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC as to GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC. (BIRK, EDWARD)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by EDWARD L BIRK (ans) (Main Document 22 replaced on 1/12/2022) (ans).
January 11, 2022 Filing 21 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3987683, $100. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(BIRK, EDWARD)
January 6, 2022 Filing 20 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(hdw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against GANNETT CO INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(hdw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(hdw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE of No Opposition filed by ANTHONY OLIVER re #10 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Expedited Discovery and Entry of Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Service by the United States Marshal's Service Against Defendants Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed USM 285 Form)(hdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2022: #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (hdw).
January 4, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Service by GANNETT CO INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC filed by Ian Kyle Byrnside. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss or Quash Service, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Alicia DeBonis 12.21.21 - Gannett, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Alicia DeBonis 12.22.21 - GateHouse, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Thomas R. Mondelli, #5 Exhibit Oliver Special Conditions of Probation)(Byrnside, Ian)
December 28, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC as to WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC. (REISE, SARAH)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY OLIVER as to GANNETT CO INC, GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC, NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons GANNETT CO, #2 Summons GATEHOUSE MEDIA, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(hdw)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 Letter regarding Prisoners not being allowed to file electronically in the Middle District of Georgia re #9 MOTION for Leave to File through the Courts EC/ECF (hdw)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER.(hdw)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File through the Courts EC/ECF Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER.(hdw)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by ANTHONY OLIVER (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A: Subpoena to Produce Documents, #3 Summons Elizabeth Ryder, #4 Envelope)(hdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2021: #5 Request for Issuance) (hdw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons GANNETT CO, #2 Summons GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP, #3 Summons GRAY MEDIA GROUP, #4 Summons NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, #5 Summons SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP, #6 Summons WJCL HEARST TELEVISION)(hdw)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/4/2021. (kat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(hdw)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Special Agent Process Server. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 10/14/2021. (kat)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Special Agent Process Server Filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(hdw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (hdw)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $ 402, Receipt Number GAM500041170,filed by ANTHONY OLIVER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 521CV361 PROPOSED SUMMONS GANNETT, #3 PROPOSED SUMMONS GATEHOUSE, #4 PROPOSED SUMMONS GRAHAM MEDIA, #5 PROPOSED SUMMONS GRAY MEDIA, #6 PROPOSED SUMMONS NEXTSTAR, #7 PROPOSED SUMMONS SINCLAIR, #8 PROPOSED SUMMONS WJCL, #9 NOTICE of Interested Parties, #10 Cover Letter, #11 Envelope)(hdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLIVER v. NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY OLIVER RESTRICTED - CHECK FILER STATUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXSTAR BROADCASTING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEHOUSE MEDIA GEORGIA HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: IAN KYLE BYRNSIDE
Represented By: STEPHEN DEREK BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAY MEDIA GROUP INC
Represented By: SARAH T REISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WJCL HEARST TELEVISION LLC
Represented By: SARAH T REISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM MEDIA GROUP INC
Represented By: EDWARD L BIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINCLAIR BROADCAST GROUP INC
Represented By: SARAH T REISE
Represented By: RICHARD W MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANNETT CO INC
Represented By: IAN KYLE BYRNSIDE
Represented By: STEPHEN DEREK BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?