ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY v. PITTS et al
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: PAMELA PITTS, STEVEN LEDBETTER, PHIL SHERIDAN CO. DBA MID-GEORGIA AUTO SALES COMPANY and PHIL SHERIDAN CO. doing business as Mid-Georgia Auto Sales Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00371
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 Jurisdictional Statement by PHIL SHERIDAN CO. (STEWART, WALKER)
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHIL SHERIDAN CO. (STEWART, WALKER)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by PHIL SHERIDAN CO..(STEWART, WALKER)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY as to STEVEN LEDBETTER. (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WALKER STEVEN STEWART on behalf of PHIL SHERIDAN CO. Attorney WALKER STEVEN STEWART added to party PHIL SHERIDAN CO.(pty:dft)(STEWART, WALKER)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Answer Pursuant to Local Rule 6.1 re #1 Complaint,, by PHIL SHERIDAN CO. (STEWART, WALKER)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by PAMELA PITTS with Jury Demand.(CAMERON, ASHLEY)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY as to PAMELA PITTS. (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY as to PHIL SHERIDAN CO.. (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ASHLEY ANN CAMERON on behalf of PAMELA PITTS (CAMERON, ASHLEY)
November 3, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by PAMELA PITTS ); Notice to Counsel ASHLEY ANN CAMERON. Your name on the document does not match the name in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your name via PACER.(hdw)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ASHLEY ANN CAMERON on behalf of PAMELA PITTS Attorney ASHLEY ANN CAMERON added to party PAMELA PITTS(pty:dft)(CAMERON, ASHLEY)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to STEVEN LEDBETTER. (hdw)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PHIL SHERIDAN CO. DBA MID-GEORGIA AUTO SALES COMPANY. (hdw)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PAMELA PITTS. (hdw)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent DONEGAL GROUP INC, Other Affiliate DONEGAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY for ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY. (KENDALL, MICHAEL)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEVEN LEDBETTER, PHIL SHERIDAN CO. DBA MID-GEORGIA AUTO SALES COMPANY, PAMELA PITTS Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3930342, $402 filed by ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Motor Vehicle Crash Report, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Add a Proper Party, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Policy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Pamela Pitts, #8 Summons Phil Sheridan Co. d/b/a Mid-Georgia Auto Sales Company, #9 Summons Steven Ledbetter)(KENDALL, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY v. PITTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC STATES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL C KENDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA PITTS
Represented By: ASHLEY ANN CAMERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN LEDBETTER
Represented By: JOHN A WILKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL SHERIDAN CO. DBA MID-GEORGIA AUTO SALES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL SHERIDAN CO. doing business as Mid-Georgia Auto Sales Company
Represented By: JOHN A WILKERSON
Represented By: WALKER STEVEN STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?