CANSLER et al v. GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Plaintiff: AMY CANSLER, ANDREW CANSLER, CHRISTOPHER LANDERS, CRISTINA LANDERS, SIDNEY FRANKLIN HESTER, CHRISTOPHER MERCER, KATHY MERCER, KATHY MONTGOMERY and VERONICA SHARP
Defendant: GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2021cv00401
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY re #18 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in S.D. Fla. Case No. 14-cv-81385-KAM, #2 Exhibit B - Motion for Summary Judgment in S.D. Fla. Case No. 10-cv-80883-KAM, #3 Exhibit C - Response to Motion for Summary Judgment in S.D. Fla. Case No. 10-cv-80883-KAM, #4 Exhibit D - Complaint in Fulton Co. Superior Court Case No. 2020CV338805, #5 Exhibit E - Georgia Powers Motion to Dismiss in Fulton Co. Superior Court Case No. 2020CV338805, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Interrogatory Responses in Fulton Co. Superior Court Case No. 2020CV338805)(BOYD, MEAGHAN)
December 28, 2021 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 11/22/2021, before Judge Tilman E. Self III. Court Reporter Darlene D. Fuller. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (ddf)
December 13, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by AMY CANSLER, ANDREW CANSLER, SIDNEY FRANKLIN HESTER, CHRISTOPHER LANDERS, CRISTINA LANDERS, CHRISTOPHER MERCER, KATHY MERCER, KATHY MONTGOMERY, VERONICA SHARP filed by STACEY GODFREY EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(EVANS, STACEY)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/06/2021 (vs)
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY filed by MEAGHAN GOODWIN BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BOYD, MEAGHAN)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III: Telephone Conference held on 11/22/2021. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller.Time in Court: 5 minutes. (chc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER re #7 Order - Rules 16/26. The parties are relieved from the deadlines contained in #7 Order - Rules 16/26 until the Court rules on Plaintiffs' forthcoming Motion to Remand. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 11/22/2021. (ech)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Sheppard Arnold on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY Attorney Douglas Sheppard Arnold added to party GEORGIA POWER COMPANY(pty:dft)(Arnold, Douglas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (JOHNSON, JOHN)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TIFFANY N WATKINS on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party AMY CANSLER(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party ANDREW CANSLER(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party SIDNEY FRANKLIN HESTER(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party CHRISTOPHER LANDERS(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party CRISTINA LANDERS(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party CHRISTOPHER MERCER(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party KATHY MERCER(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party KATHY MONTGOMERY(pty:pla), Attorney TIFFANY N WATKINS added to party VERONICA SHARP(pty:pla)(WATKINS, TIFFANY)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LEE M GILLIS, JR on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY (GILLIS, LEE)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 *** REFILED AT #10 *** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LEE M GILLIS, JR on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY Attorney LEE M GILLIS, JR added to party GEORGIA POWER COMPANY(pty:dft)(GILLIS, LEE) Modified on 11/19/2021 (hdw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DUKE R GROOVER on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY Attorney DUKE R GROOVER added to party GEORGIA POWER COMPANY(pty:dft)(GROOVER, DUKE)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/20/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts)(chc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MARY BETH HAND on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party AMY CANSLER(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party ANDREW CANSLER(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party SIDNEY FRANKLIN HESTER(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party CHRISTOPHER LANDERS(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party CRISTINA LANDERS(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party CHRISTOPHER MERCER(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party KATHY MERCER(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party KATHY MONTGOMERY(pty:pla), Attorney MARY BETH HAND added to party VERONICA SHARP(pty:pla)(HAND, MARY)
November 18, 2021 NOTICE OF SETTING hearing. Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF III. Call-in information will be sent via email to the parties. (chc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY (WARREN, SARA)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent SOUTHERN COMPANY, Other Affiliate PIEDMONT-FORREST CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN ELECTRIC GENERATING COMPANY, Other Affiliate GEORGIA POWER CHILDCARE, LLC for GEORGIA POWER COMPANY. (WARREN, SARA)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (IFP) against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- State Summons, #3 Exhibit C- State Civil Initiation Form, #4 Exhibit D- Waiver and Stipulation, #5 Exhibit E- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F- Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit G- Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit H- Entry of Appearance, #9 Exhibit I- Entry of Appearance, #10 Exhibit J- Entry of Appearance, #11 Exhibit K- State Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit L- Corrected State Notice of Removal, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(WARREN, SARA)
November 12, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 7..(hdw)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent SOUTHERN COMPANY, Other Affiliate PIEDMONT-FORREST CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN ELECTRIC GENERATING COMPANY, Other Affiliate GEORGIA POWER CHILDCARE, LLC for GEORGIA POWER COMPANY. (WARREN, SARA)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3946296, $402 filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- State Summons, #3 Exhibit C- State Civil Initiation Form, #4 Exhibit D- Waiver and Stipulation, #5 Exhibit E- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F- Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit G- Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit H- Entry of Appearance, #9 Exhibit I- Entry of Appearance, #10 Exhibit J- Notice of Notice of Removal, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(WARREN, SARA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANSLER et al v. GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY CANSLER
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW CANSLER
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER LANDERS
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTINA LANDERS
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY FRANKLIN HESTER
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MERCER
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY MERCER
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY MONTGOMERY
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA SHARP
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS COX
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Represented By: SARA WARREN
Represented By: MEAGHAN GOODWIN BOYD
Represented By: DOUGLAS SHEPPARD ARNOLD
Represented By: DUKE R GROOVER
Represented By: LEE M GILLIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?