CAMPBELL v. BERRY et al
Plaintiff: DAVID LANE CAMPBELL
Defendant: WARDEN WALTER BERRY, ERIC MARTIN, REGINA WOMBLE, PETRILLION WHIPPLE and GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2021cv00445
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by DAVID LANE CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(hdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (); granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A copy of this ORDER has been sent to the business manager of the facility in which Plaintiff is detained. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 01/10/2022. (hdw) Modified on 1/10/2022 to add docket text (hdw).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (hdw)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DAVID LANE CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Account Certification, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(hdw)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by DAVID LANE CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(hdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL v. BERRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LANE CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN WALTER BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGINA WOMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETRILLION WHIPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?