JTH TAX LLC v. TYLER et al
Plaintiff: JTH TAX LLC doing business as LIBERTY TAX SERVICE
Defendant: STEPHEN DEE TYLER and SENIOR LIFESTYLES INC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00139
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH TAX LLC as to STEPHEN DEE TYLER. (SHULTZ, CHAD)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH TAX LLC as to SENIOR LIFESTYLES INC. (SHULTZ, CHAD)
April 15, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Summons Returned Executed filed by JTH TAX LLC, #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by JTH TAX LLC ); For future filings all documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. NO NEED TO REFILE(tam)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JTH TAX LLC identifying Corporate Parent LT HOLDCO INTERMEDIATE LLC, Corporate Parent LT HOLDCO LLC, Corporate Parent NPI HOLDCO LLC, Corporate Parent NEXTPOINT FINANCIAL INC, Other Affiliate FRANCHISE GROUP INC, Other Affiliate FRANCHISE GROUP INTERMEDIATE LLC, Other Affiliate FRANCHISE GROUP NEW HOLDCO LLC for JTH TAX LLC. (SHULTZ, CHAD)
April 6, 2022 SECOND Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JTH TAX LLC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(tam)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SENIOR LIFESTYLES INC, STEPHEN DEE TYLER. (Attachments: #1 Summons Senior Lifestyles Inc)(tam)
April 4, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JTH TAX LLC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(tam)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Senior Lifestyles, Inc., Stephen Dee Tyler Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4055815, $402 filed by JTH Tax, LLC dba Liberty Tax Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 2015 Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Assignment, #3 Exhibit C, Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D, 2020 Franchise Agreement, #5 Exhibit E, Termination Notice, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons S. Tyler, #8 Summons Senior Lifestyles)(SHULTZ, CHAD)
April 1, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JTH Tax, LLC dba Liberty Tax Service ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH TAX LLC v. TYLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH TAX LLC doing business as LIBERTY TAX SERVICE
Represented By: CHAD A SHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN DEE TYLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENIOR LIFESTYLES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?