CLERVRAIN v. KEMP et al
Plaintiff: MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN
Defendant: BRIAN P KEMP, CAMERON C STAPLES, CLAY J PETRY and BARBARA GELLMAN-DANLEY
Case Number: 5:2022cv00145
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 15 JUDGMENT (ggs)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. After review, the Court finds that the plaintiff's complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and is entirely frivolous. Accordingly, the #1 plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/3/2022. (kat)
April 19, 2022 Filing 13 Letter to plaintiff regarding signature on filings (ans)
April 8, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL. (ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for "the Answer Act" ("TAA") or "Additional Defendants" Act ("ADA") by the Treaties Movement Protective Act ("TMPA") Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Settlement Agreement(s) Against Secretive Criminals by Inkoking the National Regulatory Treaties Act ("NIRTA") Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for "Serving Agencies" to Reopen "Questions of Laws", or Facts to the ANT(s) Redaction Act" (TARA") by "Prohibiting Act" (PA") Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for "Right Venue Act" "BE" "Clear Consolided Act" by Victim of Crimes Against Various Officials Apartheid Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN.(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for "Opposition(s)" or "Criminal Intent(s)" and/or "Malicious" Against Freedom of Speech(s) by the ANT(s) Freedom Act ("TAFA") Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for "Manifest Injustice Act" (MIA) or "Electronic Filling Act" Opposition(s) by Secure Academic Resources Technology Act ("SARTA") Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN.(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Congressional Power and Apex Disposition Concerns by Invoking the Detainee(s) Issues Freedom Treatment Act "DIFTA" Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for "Common Sense" or Access to the Imformative Legal Materials Or Opposition by "The ANT(s)" Library Act "TALA" Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for "Collateral Attacks" or "Compelling" or Opposition(s) Mental Cruelty Act by the Nationality Protective Act "NPA" Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for "Alien Status" or "Pauperis Status" or Criteria to Consider by Invoking the Ant(s) Movement Act "TAMA" Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLERVRAIN v. KEMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANETIRONY CLERVRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN P KEMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON C STAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAY J PETRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA GELLMAN-DANLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?