ATL 21 WR OWNER LLC v. FITZGERALD
Plaintiff: ATL 21 WR OWNER LLC doing business as ARDEN PLACE APARTMENTS
Defendant: DEWYAN FITZGERALD and SHARRIEF BEY
Case Number: 5:2022cv00421
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. If Fitzgerald wishes to proceed with his appeal, he must pay the entire $505 appellate filing fee. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/13/2023. (kat)
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 22-14243-A re #6 Notice of Appeal, filed by DEWYAN FITZGERALD. (tam)
December 20, 2022 Filing 8 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #6 Notice of Appeal, #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Judgment Judge Appealed: Treadwell. Court Reporter: None. Fee: IFP pending (tlf).
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by DEWYAN FITZGERALD (tlf).
December 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL (22-14243-A) as to #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Judgment by DEWYAN FITZGERALD (Attachments: #1 Letter from District Court to Houston County Magistrate Court, #2 First Three Pages of Order from District Court, #3 Judgment of District Court, #4 Envelope) (tlf). Modified on 12/28/2022 to add USCA Case Number (tam).
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk, Magisrate Court of Houston County enclosing certified copies of Order and Judgment remanding case. re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Judgment (ggs)
December 7, 2022 Filing 4 JUDGMENT (ggs)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fitzgerald's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and this action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Houston County, Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/7/2022. (kat)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DEWYAN FITZGERALD.(ggs)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against ATL 21 WR OWNER LLC, filed by DEWYAN FITZGERALD. Removed from the Magistrate Court of Houston County, Case No. 2022-MV-0200 0041. (Attachments: #1 Indext to Appendix, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Fact: Adverse Claim of Title and Reversion of Ancestral Estate etc, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Fact: Memorandum of Trust, #4 Affidavit of Fact: Writ of Quo Warranto, #5 Affidavit of Fact: Default Judgment, #6 Affidavit of Fact: Writ of Error, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ggs) Modified on 11/28/2022 to edit text. (ggs). Modified on 11/28/2022 (ggs). All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATL 21 WR OWNER LLC v. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEWYAN FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARRIEF BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATL 21 WR OWNER LLC doing business as ARDEN PLACE APARTMENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?