FEE DEPOSITORY
Plaintiff: PLAINTIFF
Defendant: DEFENDANT
Case Number: 5:2022tc07000
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-4008036, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Edward N. Boehm, Jr. BAR NO. 183411 Email to: kbeech@fisherphillips.com (Boehm, Edward)
February 3, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-4008350, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Benjamin Alexander Stone BAR NO. 683850 Email to: ben.stone@mungerandstone.com (STONE, BENJAMIN)
February 2, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-4007690, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY J. Micah Dickie BAR NO. 324015 Email to: dguy@fisherphillips.com (DICKIE, JAMES)
February 2, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-4007104, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Carlos A. Fernandez BAR NO. 769087 Email to: carlos.fernandez@fmglaw.com (FERNANDEZ, CARLOS)
January 25, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3999973, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Dylan J. Hooper BAR NO. 194606 Email to: dhooper@forthepeople.com (HOOPER, DYLAN)
January 20, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3995937, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Dominyka Plukaite BAR NO. 241132 Email to: dominyka.plukaite@troutman.com (PLUKAITE, DOMINYKA)
January 20, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3996483, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Jonathan E. Green BAR NO. 307053 Email to: atolliver@bakerdonelson.com (GREEN, JONATHAN)
January 19, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3994951, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY BAR NO. 659432 Email to: efriedman@sgrlaw.com (FRIEDMAN, EMILY)
January 19, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3995437, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Darren W. Penn BAR NO. 571322 Email to: faustina@pennlawgroup.com (PENN, DARREN)
January 19, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3995444, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Kevin M. Ketner BAR NO. 418233 Email to: faustina@pennlawgroup.com (PENN, DARREN)
January 19, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3995442, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Alexandra Cole BAR NO. 696892 Email to: faustina@pennlawgroup.com (PENN, DARREN)
January 18, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3993845, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Kevin Crayon BAR NO. 903973 Email to: kevin@crayonlawfirm.com (CRAYON, KEVIN)
January 18, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3992852, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Rachel Bondi BAR NO. 896738 Email to: Amie.Rich@fmglaw.com (BONDI, RACHEL)
January 13, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3990491, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Daniel Richard Duello BAR NO. 342855 Email to: daniel@duellolaw.com (DUELLO, DANIEL)
January 12, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3988926, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Wade Wilkes Herring, III BAR NO. 278313 Email to: wherring@law.ga.gov (HERRING, WADE)
January 12, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3989255, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Leslie K. Eason BAR NO. 100186 Email to: rmcdowell@grsm.com (Eason, Leslie)
January 11, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3987043, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Caitlin J. Sandley BAR NO. 610130 Email to: cj.sandley@splcenter.org (SANDLEY, CAITLIN)
January 7, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3984552, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY John Henry Bedard, Jr. BAR NO. 043473 Email to: jbedard@bedardlawgroup.com (BEDARD, JOHN)
January 7, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3985511, $20 - MAIL CERTIFICATE Jonathon A. Fligg BAR NO. 264402 Mail to: 271 17th Street, NW, Suite 2400, Atlanta, GA 30363 (FLIGG, JONATHON)
January 7, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3985512, $20 - MAIL CERTIFICATE Jonathon A. Fligg BAR NO. 264402 Mail to: 271 17th Street, NW, Suite 2400, Atlanta, GA 30363 (FLIGG, JONATHON)
January 6, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3984037, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Joseph A. Prescott BAR NO. 966471 Email to: jprescott@wwhgd.com (PRESCOTT, JOSEPH)
January 6, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3984523, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Jehae Kim BAR NO. 548575 Email to: jkim@law.ga.gov (KIM, JEHAE)
January 5, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3983111, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Paula K Smith BAR NO. 662160 Email to: psmith@law.ga.gov (SMITH, PAULA)
January 4, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - Receipt # AGAMDC-3982165, $20 - EMAIL DELIVERY Courtney C. Poole BAR NO. 560587 Email to: cpoole@law.ga.gov (POOLE, COURTNEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEE DEPOSITORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLAINTIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?