TURNER v. BEACH-OSWALD IMMIGRATION LAW & ASSOCIATES et al
Plaintiff: TERRANCE TURNER
Defendant: BEACH-OSWALD IMMIGRATION LAW & ASSOCIATES, DANIELLE BEACH-OSWALD, SARAH METZEL, USSOCOM, FBI, CIA, NSA, GEO SPATIAL, GCHQ, TRUMP WHITE HOUSE, SECRET SERVICE, USPS, FEDEX, PFIZER and MERCK
Case Number: 5:2023cv00050
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 9 JUDGMENT (vs)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice, and Turner's pending motion to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is DENIED as moot. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 3/2/2023. (kat)
February 28, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by TERRANCE TURNER (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Turner is ORDERED to show cause, no later than February 24, 2023, why the Court should not dismiss his case for making a false statement under oath and for failure to comply with the Court's order. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/14/2023. (kat)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TERRANCE TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing SIGNED copy of Complaint by TERRANCE TURNER re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 8, 2023 Filing 3 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER. If the plaintiff wishes to file a pro se complaint in this district, all pleadings must include his signature. Further, the plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or to complete a proper Middle District of Georgia non-prisoner application to proceed IFP. The completed form SHALL include his signature. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send a non-prisoner application to proceed IFP to the plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 2/8/2023. (kat)
February 8, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TERRANCE TURNER, #1 Complaint, filed by TERRANCE TURNER ); Every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must re-file your signed document within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court. See F.R.Civ.P. 11.(ggs)
February 6, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by TERRANCE TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by TERRANCE TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Breach of Contract Guide, #3 Notice of Lawsuit to Beach-Oswald, #4 Notice of Lawsuit to Beach-Oswald, #5 Waiver to Beash-Oswald, #6 Waiver to Beach-Oswald, #7 Envelope)(tlf)
February 6, 2023 Case REASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL. US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III no longer assigned to the case. (vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. BEACH-OSWALD IMMIGRATION LAW & ASSOCIATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEACH-OSWALD IMMIGRATION LAW & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE BEACH-OSWALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH METZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USSOCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO SPATIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCHQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUMP WHITE HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRET SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?