CARTER v. GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY F. CARTER
Defendant: GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2023cv00170
Filed: May 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Referring Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing re #9 MOTION to Remand by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY filed by MEAGHAN GOODWIN BOYD.(BOYD, MEAGHAN)
July 7, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is - MOTION FOR HEARING.(vs)
July 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Remand by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY (BOYD, MEAGHAN)
July 5, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to Response filed by TIMOTHY F. CARTER re #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arwood Filings [Reply], #2 B - SEC Filing [Reply])(EVANS, STACEY)
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY re #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Radioactive decay chains for uranium and thorium, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Specific causation reports)(BOYD, MEAGHAN)
June 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DOUGLAS SHEPPARD ARNOLD on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY Attorney DOUGLAS SHEPPARD ARNOLD added to party GEORGIA POWER COMPANY(pty:dft)(ARNOLD, DOUGLAS)
May 31, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by TIMOTHY F. CARTER filed by STACEY GODFREY EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit A (Appendix of Corresponding Allegations), #3 Exhibit B (2022.02.16 Hearing Transcript), #4 Exhibit C (NRC-GA Agreement), #5 Exhibit D (Public Notice re Variance), #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Annual Reports)(EVANS, STACEY)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay pending Plaintiffs forthcoming motion for remand. If the Court so denies Plaintiffs forthcoming motion for remand, Defendant Georgia Power Company shall have 14 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs motion to remand to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (or First Amended Complaint, if filed). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 05/30/2023 (elp)
May 26, 2023 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Stay Deadlines by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY filed by MEAGHAN GOODWIN BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines)(BOYD, MEAGHAN)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting (7) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00169-CAR; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00170-CAR; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00172-CAR; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00174-CAR; granting (6) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00175-CAR; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00176-CAR; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00177-CAR; granting (6) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:23-cv-00178-CAR Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 05/26/2023 (vs)
May 25, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by TIMOTHY F. CARTER filed by STACEY GODFREY EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(EVANS, STACEY)
May 22, 2023 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL. CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL no longer assigned to the case. (ans)
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SARA WARREN on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY Attorney SARA WARREN added to party GEORGIA POWER COMPANY(pty:dft)(WARREN, SARA)
May 18, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent THE SOUTHERN COMPANY, Other Affiliate PIEDMONT-FORREST CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN ELECTRIC GENERATING COMPANY, Other Affiliate GEORGIA POWER CHILDCARE LLC for GEORGIA POWER COMPANY. (BOYD, MEAGHAN)
May 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MEAGHAN GOODWIN BOYD on behalf of GEORGIA POWER COMPANY (BOYD, MEAGHAN)
May 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against TIMOTHY F. CARTER Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4374536, $402 filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit C State Court Case Filing Information Form, #5 Exhibit D State Court Notice of Appearance of B. Adams and M. Hand, #6 Exhibit E State Court Notice of Appearance of T. Watkins, #7 Exhibit F State Court Notice of Appearance of J. Johnson, #8 Exhibit G State Court Waiver of Service and Stipulation of Extension of Time, #9 Exhibit H State Court M. Hand Application for Leave of Absence, #10 Exhibit I State Court B. Hand Application for Leave of Absence, #11 Exhibit J State Court Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit K DPH Health Consultation, #13 Exhibit L Arwood Complaint, #14 Exhibit M Arwood Interrogatory Excerpt, #15 Exhibit N Arwood Plaintiffs Rule 34 Request for Inspection Excerpt) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(BOYD, MEAGHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY F. CARTER
Represented By: JOHN AMBLE JOHNSON
Represented By: MARY BETH HAND
Represented By: STACEY GODFREY EVANS
Represented By: BRIAN P ADAMS
Represented By: CALE H CONLEY
Represented By: TIFFANY N WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA POWER COMPANY
Represented By: MEAGHAN GOODWIN BOYD
Represented By: DOUGLAS SHEPPARD ARNOLD
Represented By: SARA WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?