WHITTLE v. DOOLY STATE PRISON et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS ANDREW WHITTLE
Defendant: DOOLY STATE PRISON, CAPTAIN RODRIGEZ, COUNSELOR GERMANY, CERT OFFICER PAUL, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, LIEUTENANT SMITH, LIEUTENANT CROSS, CERT TEAM MEMBER and UNKNOWN OFFICER
Case Number: 5:2023cv00181
Filed: May 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7/7/23. (mjm)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to pay filing fee or submit a complete motion to proceed IFP, including a certified copy of Plaintiff's inmate trust fund account statement. The Clerk is directed to forward Plaintiff an account certification form. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-16-23. (jdl)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5/24/2023. (sst) Modified document number on 5/24/2023 (ans).
May 23, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by THOMAS ANDREW WHITTLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sst)
May 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by THOMAS ANDREW WHITTLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sst)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITTLE v. DOOLY STATE PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ANDREW WHITTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOOLY STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN RODRIGEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNSELOR GERMANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT OFFICER PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT CROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERT TEAM MEMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?