FLOOD v. EMMERT et al
Plaintiff: SCOTTY DEAN FLOOD
Defendant: OFFICER T EMMERT, DISTRICT ATTORNEY MIKE D SMITH, ADMINISTRATOR M WESTBROOK and MAJOR B BLANTON
Case Number: 5:2025cv00029
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC T TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Filing 6 Letter regarding needing help. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rka)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Recast Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to recast his Complaint on the Courts standard form. Plaintiff is thus ORDERED to either pay the Courts $405.00 filing fee in full or submit a proper and complete motion to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee, which should include a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide Plaintiff with the appropriate forms for this purpose, marked with the case number of this case. Plaintiff shall have FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date shown on this Order to (1) either pay the required filing fee or submit a proper and complete motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this action and (2) file a recast complaint with the Clerk of Court. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 03/05/2025. (rka)
January 31, 2025 Filing 4 Letter regarding misspelling of middle name. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rka)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rka)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SCOTTY DEANDRE FLOOD. (Attachments: #1 Account Certification). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(rka)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B BLANTON, T EMMERT, MIKE D SMITH, M WESTBROOK,filed by SCOTTY DEANDRE FLOOD. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Scotty Flood, #2 Reply to Inmate Request, #3 Statement of Scotty Flood, #4 Notes from Scotty Flood, #5 Statement of Scotty Flood)(rka) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2025: #6 Envelope) (rka). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/27/2025) (rka).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLOOD v. EMMERT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTTY DEAN FLOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER T EMMERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MIKE D SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATOR M WESTBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR B BLANTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?