Mann et al v. Donald et al
Plaintiff: Astaniel Jarvis Mann, Pip Heng, Elijah Adcock, Ronny N. Askew, Rickie Lee Fox, Jodrph Daniel Fincher and Shedrick D. Ross
Defendant: James Donald, Rick Jacobs, Sarah Draper, Sharon Lewis, Warden Hart, Deputy Warden McLaughlin, Albert Jones, Captain Morris, Lt. Maine, Officer Powell, Jesse Howell, T. Brown, Officer Yancey, Officer Cannon, Officer Snake, Officer Smith, Officer Shane, Officer Grainger, Officer Radcliff, Sergeant Bond, Officer Page, Officer Daniel, Officer Bates, John Doe 1 and John Doe 2
Case Number: 7:2008cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Hodge
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 168 Motion for Court Order for Production of Documents. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/15/2013. (nbp)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Sever; finding as moot 116 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 117 Motion to Sever; granting 118 Motion to Sever; denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 131 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 153 Report and Recommendations; adopting 154 Report and Recommendations; adopting 155 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/14/2012. (nbp)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER staying case as to Defendant Powers. Case will move forward as to remaining parties. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 11/09/2011. (nbp)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER directing parties to complete briefing on Motions to Sever and Motion to Bifurcate. Court will defer ruling on these motions until after ruling on any motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 6/23/2011. (nbp)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 107 Motion for Depositiion by Remote Means. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/17/2011. (nbp)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Dismiss; adopting with modifications 93 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/14/2011. (nbp)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Certify Class; adopting Report and Recommendations re 62 Report and Recommendations.Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/4/2010. (nbp)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Pip Heng, Ronny N Askew, Astaniel Jarvis Mann, Shedrick D. Ross, Jodrph Daniel Fincher, Rickie Lee Fox, Elijah Adcock, 54 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alonzo Morefield, Jr Ordered by U.S. Mag. Judge G. Mallon Faircloth on 12/30/09. (GMF)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/1/2009. (nbp)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 27 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 34 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/25/2009. (nbp)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 27 MOTION Motion to Join as Plaintiffs Ellis Keel, Michael A. Walker, George C. Haskell, Andrew Hart, and Joseph Alan Greene and Motion to Join Additional Defendants re 1 Complaint,MOTION Motion to Join as Plaintiffs Ellis Keel, Michael A. Walker, George C. Haskell, Andrew Hart, and Joseph Alan Greene and Motion to Join Additional Defendants re 1 Complaint, filed by Pip Heng, Ronny N Askew, Astaniel Jarvis Mann, Shedrick D. Ross, Jodrph Daniel Fincher, Rickie Lee Fox, Elijah Adcock Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2009. Ordered by U.S. Mag. Judge Richard L. Hodge on 02/27/2009. (RLH)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by T. Brown, Sarah Draper, James Donald, Officer Shane, Warden Hart, Officer Page, Officer Snake, Albert Jones, Captain Morris, Officer Bates, Officer Cannon, Officer Powell, Rick J acobs, Deputy Warden McLaughlin, Officer Smith, Officer Radcliff, Officer Yancey, Lieutenant Maine, Jesse Howell, Sergeant Bond, Sharon Lewis. TO GRANT IN PART AND TO DENY IN PART. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2009. Ordered by U.S. Mag. Judge Richard L. Hodge on 02/24/2009. (RLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann et al v. Donald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astaniel Jarvis Mann
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pip Heng
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Adcock
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny N. Askew
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie Lee Fox
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodrph Daniel Fincher
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedrick D. Ross
Represented By: McNeill Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Snake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grainger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?