Williams v. Mast Biosurgery USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Williams
Defendant: Mast Biosurgery USA, Inc. and Mast Biosurgery AG
Case Number: 7:2008cv00114
Filed: August 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Colquitt
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER finding as moot 40 Motion to Preclude Use of Expert Witness Testimony; granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/24/2010. (nbp)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER resetting scheduling deadlines. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/3/2010. (nbp)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER directing parties to take deposition of Dr. Adcock not later than 3/15/2010. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 1/28/2010. (nbp)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER memorializing oral order given from the bench and granting 32 Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All discovery to be completed not later than 1/31/2010. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/11/2009. (nbp)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Preclude. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/2/2009. (nbp)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Court directing reinstatement, dismissal and judgment as to certain defendants. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/7/2009. (nbp)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Response as to status of service. Deadline for response to this Order is ten (10) days from the date of entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/23/2009. (nbp)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff to properly allege jurisdiction no later than twenty (20) days from this date. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/5/2008. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mast Biosurgery USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Williams
Represented By: Joseph D. Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mast Biosurgery USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mast Biosurgery AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?