Branham v. Astrue
Plaintiff: William A. Branham
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 7:2008cv00123
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 1/28/2010. (nbp)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Clerk to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff and giving Plaintiff until 6/1/2009 to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/28/2009. (nbp)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 6 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/15/2009. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branham v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Branham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?