Moore v. Keene et al
Plaintiff: Walter Everett Moore, III
Defendant: Michelle Keene, Sgt. James, Sheriff Prine, Corp. Adcock and Shirley Lewis
Case Number: 7:2009cv00098
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Hodge
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER of Court following non-jury trial. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/27/2013. (nbp)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 47 Motion to Enforce Judgment; adopting 51 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/4/2012. (nbp)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 36 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 6/11/2012. (nbp)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 23 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/7/2011. (nbp)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 5 Report and Recommendations.Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/15/2009. (nbp)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Complaint filed by Walter Everett Moore, III Ordered by U.S. Mag. Judge Richard L. Hodge on 09/21/2009. (RLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Keene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Everett Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Prine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corp. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?