Kingdom Insurance Group LLC et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: KINGDOM BENEFITS ASSOCIATION LLC, Kingdom Business Services LLC, KINGDOM INSURANCE GROUP LLC and Kingdomcare LLC
Defendant: James Bletzer, Howard Jefferson, Richard Frommeyer, Jerry Boles, United Healthcare Insurance Company, David Harris and Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC
Case Number: 7:2010cv00079
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Thomas
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2011 Filing 35 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by Southern District of Texas; Case Number 4:11-CV-02103. (sbd)
May 31, 2011 Filing 34 Case Electronically Transferred Out- District Transfer to Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.** (rlw)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer. Case is transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. The pending #13 Motion to Dismiss is active and transferred with the case. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/31/2011. (nbp)
January 21, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE Withdrawal of Jeremy S. Hyndman by James Bletzer, Richard Frommeyer, United Healthcare Insurance Company (Hopkins, John)
November 8, 2010 Filing 31 REPLY to Response filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer re #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hopkins, John)
November 8, 2010 Filing 30 REPLY to Response filed by Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, :MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ashe, Robert)
October 8, 2010 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC re #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Zachary S. Lewis)(Bruyere, Michael)
October 8, 2010 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, :MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Zachary S. Lewis)(Bruyere, Michael)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER as to #17 16/26 Report of parties. The Court stays discovery in this case until such time as a ruling is made on [12,13] Motions to Dismiss. The Court has considered the parties' proposed Scheduling Order but is not inclined to deviate from its standard order. Therefore, if this case continues beyond the ruling on the Motions to Dismiss, the Court will file its standard Scheduling/Discovery Order. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/5/2010. (nbp)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting parties' #26 Consent Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/5/2010. (nbp)
September 29, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, :MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, :, #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC filed by Michael P. Bruyere. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruyere, Michael)
September 28, 2010 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent UHIC Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent United Healthcare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Hopkins, John)
September 28, 2010 Filing 24 Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): #22 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosure filed by Richard Frommeyer, United Healthcare Insurance Company, James Bletzer, #20 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosure filed by Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, David Harris ). (sbd)
September 28, 2010 Filing 23 Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): #19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company ). (sbd)
September 27, 2010 Filing 22 RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURE by United Healthcare Insurance Company, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer.(Hopkins, John)
September 27, 2010 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC (Ashe, Robert)
September 27, 2010 Filing 20 RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURE by Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson.(Ashe, Robert)
September 27, 2010 Filing 19 THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN FILED CORRECTLY AT #25. Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company (Hopkins, John) Modified text on 9/29/2010 (sbd).
September 27, 2010 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC (Bruyere, Michael)
September 23, 2010 Filing 17 Rules 16/26 Discovery Report filed by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC. Related document: #2 Order - Rules 16/26.(Hopkins, John)
September 23, 2010 Filing 16 Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): #15 Rules 16/26 Discovery Report (Judge Lawson Only), Rules 16/26 Discovery Report (Judge Lawson Only) filed by Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, James Bletzer, Jerry Boles, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, David Harris, Richard Frommeyer, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC ). (sbd)
September 22, 2010 Filing 15 Rules 16/26 Discovery Report filed by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC. Related document: #2 Order - Rules 16/26.(Hopkins, John)
September 22, 2010 Filing 14 Rules 16/26 Discovery Report filed by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC. Related document: #2 Order - Rules 16/26.(Kane, John)
September 3, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer filed by John David Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit James Bletzer, #3 Affidavit Richard Frommeyer)(Hopkins, John)
September 3, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, : by Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson filed by Robert Lawrence Ashe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ashe, Robert)
August 27, 2010 Declination to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge by John David Hopkins on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (Hopkins, John)
August 27, 2010 Filing 11 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendants (Hopkins, John)
August 27, 2010 Filing 10 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendant (Ashe, Robert)
August 27, 2010 Declination to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge by Robert Lawrence Ashe on behalf of Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (Ashe, Robert)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule; granting #9 Amended Motion. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/26/2010. (nbp)
August 26, 2010 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION Amending #5 MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule of Pending Motions and Responsive Pleadings by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC filed by Robert Lawrence Ashe.(Ashe, Robert)
August 26, 2010 Filing 8 Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): #7 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, James Bletzer, Jerry Boles, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, David Harris, Richard Frommeyer, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC ). (rlw)
August 25, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE Consent Motion to Correct Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule on Pending Motions and Responsive Pleadings by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC (Ashe, Robert)
August 25, 2010 Filing 6 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Plaintiffs (Bruyere, Michael)
August 25, 2010 Declination to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge by Michael P. Bruyere on behalf of Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2) (Bruyere, Michael)
August 24, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule of Pending Motions and Responsive Pleadings by Kingdom Benefits Association LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC, Kingdom Insurance Group LLC, Richard Frommeyer, James Bletzer, David Harris, Jerry Boles, Howard Jefferson, Kingdom Business Services LLC, Kingdomcare LLC filed by Robert Lawrence Ashe.(Ashe, Robert)
August 16, 2010 Filing 4 Arbitration Referral Letter sent 8/16/2010 (hrm)
August 13, 2010 Filing 3 Election Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)). (sbd)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/13/2010. (Attachments: #1 Required Form Scheduling/Discovery Report)(nbp)
August 11, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by all defendants from Thomas County Superior Court, case number 09-CV-1088, consisting of Interrogatories, Responses to Interrogatories, Notice to Clerk of Removal, Notice of Removal, First Amended Complaint, etc.. (Filing fee $ 350 Receipt Number 113G0000000000966189),filed by all defendants. (Attachments: #1 Kingdom Ins. Groups's Response to UH 1st Interrogatories, #2 Kingdom Business Services' Response to Interrogatories, #3 Kingdom Benefit's Response to Interrogatories, #4 Kingdomcare's Response to 1st Interrogatories, #5 First Amended Complaint, #6 Frommeyer's Objection and Response to Pltfs.' 1st Interrogatories, #7 Bletzer's Objection and Response to Pltfs.' 1st Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H-1 - Defts.' 2009 Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit H-2, #10 Exhibit H-3, #11 Exhibit H-4, #12 Exhibit H-5, #13 Exhibit H-6, #14 Exhibit H-7, #15 Exhbit H-8, #16 Exhibit H-9, #17 Exhibit H-10, #18 Exhibit H-11, #19 Exhibit H-12, #20 Exhibit H-13, #21 Exhibit H-14)(sbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2010: #22 Civil Cover Sheet) (sbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingdom Insurance Group LLC et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bletzer
Represented By: JEREMY S HYNDMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JOY CAMPBELL
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: John David Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jefferson
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: Jeffrey O. Bramlett
Represented By: WILLIAM P LANGDALE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Frommeyer
Represented By: JEREMY S HYNDMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JOY CAMPBELL
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: John David Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Boles
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: Jeffrey O. Bramlett
Represented By: WILLIAM P LANGDALE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: JEREMY S HYNDMAN
Represented By: ELIZABETH JOY CAMPBELL
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: John David Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harris
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: Jeffrey O. Bramlett
Represented By: WILLIAM P LANGDALE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protectors Insurance & Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: Jeffrey O. Bramlett
Represented By: WILLIAM P LANGDALE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGDOM BENEFITS ASSOCIATION LLC
Represented By: John F. Kane
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: R. Bruce Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdom Business Services LLC
Represented By: John F. Kane
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: R. Bruce Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGDOM INSURANCE GROUP LLC
Represented By: John F. Kane
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: R. Bruce Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdomcare LLC
Represented By: John F. Kane
Represented By: Michael P. Bruyere
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe
Represented By: R. Bruce Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?