Newberne v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: Chere Lavon Newberne
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 7:2012cv00080
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas Q Langstaff
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 2/19/2014. (nbp)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/15/2013. (nbp)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Remand. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/6/2012. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberne v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chere Lavon Newberne
Represented By: CHARLES LEE MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?