LEE v. BANK OF AMERICA NA

Plaintiff: PATRICIA BENTON LEE
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Case Number: 7:2013cv00008
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Thomas
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file interrogatory responses not later than 9/6/2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/23/2013. (nbp)
May 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff must file amended complaint not later than 6/3/2013; failure will result in dismissal of case without further order of this Court. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/15/2013. (nbp)
March 1, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/1/2013. (nbp)
February 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling status conference scheduled for 2/25/2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/19/2013. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. BANK OF AMERICA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA BENTON LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Represented By: JARROD S MENDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?