LANE v. Philbin et al

Defendant: Ted Philbin and SHUNDRA WOODS
Plaintiff: RODNEY MANYON LANE
Case Number: 7:2013cv00036
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Lowndes
Referring Judge: Thomas Q Langstaff
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/23/2013. (nbp)
February 25, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 39 Report and Recommendations; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 22 Motion for TRO. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 2/25/2014. (nbp)
April 11, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 48 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 4/11/2014. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANE v. Philbin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHUNDRA WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY MANYON LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.