NIXON v. United Parcel Service Inc
Plaintiff: LARRY THOMAS NIXON
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Case Number: 7:2013cv00038
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Tift
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER vacating 23 Order filed 6/3/2014 and making this order the order of the court. (nbp)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The 23 Order filed this date stands as vacated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge HUGH LAWSON on 6/3/2014. (nbp)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson on December 24, 2013. (mbh)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Response to Motion 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/3/2013. (nbp)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER giving Plaintiff until 10/18/2013 to effect service on Defendant. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 8/21/2013. (nbp)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/3/2013. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIXON v. United Parcel Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY THOMAS NIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?