ADU v. GALLAGHER et al
Petitioner: NDUDI BENSON ADU
Respondent: PATRICK GARTLAND, JEFF B SESSIONS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE), BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER and PHIL BICKHAM
Case Number: 7:2018cv00103
Filed: July 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Eleanor Louisa DeGolian - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (rlw)
July 3, 2018 Filing 43 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to NDUDI BENSON ADU (rlw)
July 3, 2018 Filing 42 DISREGARD - No document attached Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to NDUDI BENSON ADU (rlw) Modified on 7/3/2018 (rlw).
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
July 3, 2018 US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES added. (rlw)
July 3, 2018 Filing 40 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00009. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER directing the Clerk to TRANSFER the instant cause of action to the Middle District of Georgia, Valdosta Division re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/3/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #35 Reply to Response to Motion filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU filed by Patrick Gartland. (Statkus, Shannon) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of Patrick Gartland. (Patrick, Bradford) Modified on 5/10/2018 (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Patrick Gartland re #35 Reply to Response to Motion. (Statkus, Shannon) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 Cross MOTION to Dismiss and Respondent's Reply Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Brief (Doc 24) filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU. (Sandick, Philip) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by Patrick Gartland (Status Update). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ICE Form I-830)(Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 5/4/2018 (ca). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave of Absence by Shannon H. Statkus for the dates of June 1 through June 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on April 27, 2018. (pmh) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 Cross MOTION to Dismiss and Respondent's Reply Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Brief (Doc 24). Responses due by 5/7/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re: #30 Cross MOTION to Dismiss. Petitioner is ORDERED to file any objections to the Respondent's motion for a dismissal or to otherwise inform the Court of his decision not to object to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/23/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 31 Respondent's Reply Brief to Petitioner's #24 Brief, filed by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L)(Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 4/20/2018 (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 19, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #29 MOTION for Leave of Absence Requested by Shannon H. Statkus, Esquire, for dates of: June 1, 2018 through June 15, 2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 30 Cross MOTION to Dismiss and Respondent's Reply Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Brief (Doc 24) by Patrick Gartland. Responses due by 5/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L)(Statkus, Shannon) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, Patrick Gartland, JEFF B SESSIONS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) for dates of : June 1, 2018 through June 15, 2018 by PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, Patrick Gartland, JEFF B SESSIONS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE). Responses due by 5/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/3/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Containing Medical Records Under Seal. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to FILE UNDER SEAL the following documents: 1) Adu's medical records, which are referenced at Docket Number 24-3; 2) Pages 14 through 33 and page 36 of Docket Number 1-4; and 3) Docket Number 12-2. These documents shall remain under seal until further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/3/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 28, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Substitute Party Without Government Objection. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Party Without Government Objection by NDUDI BENSON ADU. Responses due by 4/11/2018. (Sandick, Philip) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Nardone on behalf of JEFF B SESSIONS. (Nardone, Suzanne) Modified on 3/26/2018 (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 24 BRIEF Filed Pursuant to Scheduling Order by NDUDI BENSON ADU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Reverend Adu, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of 11-22-16 Hearing, #3 Exhibit C - Medical Records)(DeGolian, Eleanor) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2018: #4 Exhibit C) (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 13, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Containing Medical Records Under Seal. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Containing Medical Records Under Seal by NDUDI BENSON ADU. Responses due by 3/27/2018. (DeGolian, Eleanor) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Aaron Sandick on behalf of Ndudi Benson Adu. (Sandick, Philip) Modified on 3/13/2018 (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Louisa DeGolian on behalf of NDUDI BENSON ADU. (DeGolian, Eleanor) Modified on 2/21/2018 (ca). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, JEFF B SESSIONS. (Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 2/21/2018 (ca). [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE To All Counsel of Record re: #17 Case Transfer. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 18 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 7:17-cv-00171. Case transferred electronically [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Georgia Southern. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 2/28/2018. (sbd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Transfer Case. This case is hereby transferred to the Waycross Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 2/13/2018. (aks) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Transfer Case by NDUDI BENSON ADU filed by AARON KARL BLOCK.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(BLOCK, AARON) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot #11 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #14 Motion for Entry of briefing schedule. As requested, Petitioner has forty-five (45) days to file brief. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-29-18 (bdd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION For Entry of Order Setting Briefing Schedule by NDUDI BENSON ADU filed by AARON KARL BLOCK.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(BLOCK, AARON) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AARON KARL BLOCK on behalf of NDUDI BENSON ADU Attorney AARON KARL BLOCK added to party NDUDI BENSON ADU(pty:pet) (BLOCK, AARON) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, against PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, JEFF B SESSIONS by NDUDI BENSON ADU (Attachments: #1 Exhs. 1-14 - Identification documents, warnings Petitioner received, various pictures, #2 Exh. 15 - Medical documents, #3 Envelope)(sbd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Response to Respondent's Response Filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(rlw) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, JEFF B SESSIONS. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of DO Michael D. Taylor and Supporting Documents)(SNELL, BERNARD) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
December 13, 2017 REMARK: Call received to change Petitioner's address; he has been transferred to Folkston ICE Processing Center, P. O. Box 248, Folkston, GA 31537. Written notice of change of address to follow. (rlw) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 RETURN RESPONSE (28:2241) filed by PHIL BICKHAM, JEFF B SESSIONS, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU. Respondents are to file a comprehensive response within twenty-eight (28) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-17-17. (bdd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, JEFF B SESSIONS (SNELL, BERNARD) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BERNARD SNELL on behalf of PHIL BICKHAM, BLAINE DUKE, SEAN GALLAGHER, JEFF B SESSIONS Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party PHIL BICKHAM(pty:res), Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party BLAINE DUKE(pty:res), Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party SEAN GALLAGHER(pty:res), Attorney BERNARD SNELL added to party JEFF B SESSIONS(pty:res) (SNELL, BERNARD) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by NDUDI BENSON ADU. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-13-17. (bdd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to NDUDI ADU. (sbd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 41683.), filed by NDUDI ADU. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Brief for Petitioner for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Eleventh Circuit's grant of stay of removal and Motion for Petitioner of Review for the dismissal of Petitioner's appeal by the (BIA), #3 Brief for Petitioner's Appeal filed with the BIA 12/19/17, #4 Petitioner's Parole Request and Medical Records sent to ICE on 6/15/17, #5 ICE Decision to Continue Detention of Petitioners and Requests Petitioner sent to ICE, #6 Statement of Petitioner and Evidence of the Death of Late Wife, Son, and Father of Petitioner, #7 Envelope)(sbd) [Transferred from gasd on 7/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADU v. GALLAGHER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PATRICK GARTLAND
Represented By: BRADFORD COLLINS PATRICK
Represented By: SHANNON STATKUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFF B SESSIONS
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: SUZANNE NARDONE
Represented By: SHANNON STATKUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BLAINE DUKE
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: SHANNON STATKUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: SHANNON STATKUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PHIL BICKHAM
Represented By: BERNARD SNELL
Represented By: SHANNON STATKUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NDUDI BENSON ADU
Represented By: PHILIP AARON SANDICK
Represented By: AARON KARL BLOCK
Represented By: Eleanor Louisa DeGolian
Represented By: ELEANOR DEGOLIAN KASPER
Represented By: KRISTIN K RAMSAY
Represented By: METHAWEE MANUPIPATPONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?