FRAZIER v. COLLINS

Plaintiff: CARSTEAN FRAZIER
Defendant: MICHELLE COLLINS
Case Number: 7:2018cv00175
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 10 CORRECTED ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss by 1/2/19. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 12/11/18. (sbd)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by not later than January 2, 2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 12/11/2018. (aks) Modified text on 12/12/2018 - copy of order not mailed to Plaintiff due to confusion of due date of response (sbd).
November 20, 2018 8 DEPOSITION of Carstean Frazier taken on 02/11/2012 filed by MICHELLE COLLINS. Related document: #7 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by MICHELLE COLLINS, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : filed by MICHELLE COLLINS.(SEWELL, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2018 7 Certificate of Need to File Discovery Deposition Transcript of Carstean Frazier by MICHELLE COLLINS. Related document: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : filed by MICHELLE COLLINS.(SEWELL, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : by MICHELLE COLLINS filed by MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit D to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit E to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit F to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit G to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit H to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #10 Affidavit of Michelle Collins)(SEWELL, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2018 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by MICHELLE COLLINS. (SEWELL, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2018 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR on behalf of MICHELLE COLLINS Attorney MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR added to party MICHELLE COLLINS(pty:dft) (SEWELL, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2018 3 Letter from Plaintiff stating she has sent, faxed and called Mrs. Michelle Collins. (Attachments: #1 General Information sheet - Archbold Medical Center, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
October 22, 2018 REMARK: Mailed a copy of Rule 4 service instructions to Plaintiff. (sbd)
October 17, 2018 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CARSTEAN FRAZIER (rlw)
October 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against MICHELLE COLLINS filed by CARSTEAN FRAZIER. Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 42138 (Attachments: #1 Complaint for a Civil Case, #2 Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, #3 Envelope)(rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRAZIER v. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARSTEAN FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE COLLINS
Represented By: MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?