STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC v UPR PRODUCTS INC, et al.
Plaintiff: Steeda Autosports, LLC and STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC
Defendant: UPR Products, Inc., Joseph Mainiero, DOES 1-10, UPR PRODUCTS INC and DOES 1 - 10
Case Number: 7:2018cv00185
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPR PRODUCTS INC (Harbin, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue by JOSEPH MAINIERO, UPR PRODUCTS INC filed by John W Harbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Joseph Mainiero)(Harbin, John)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Stipulation filed by STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/6/18. (sbd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Answer by STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC (BINGHAM, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (BINGHAM, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued (BINGHAM, WILLIAM)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 AO120, Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Forwarded this date, by virtue of this notice, to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, Alexandria, VA. (sbd) Modified docket text on 11/8/2018 (sbd).
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UPR PRODUCTS INC. (sbd)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JOSEPH MAINIERO. (sbd)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC. (sbd)
November 8, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (sbd)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steeda Autosports, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Steeda Autosports LLC for Steeda Autosports, LLC. (BINGHAM, WILLIAM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steeda Autosports, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3016998, $400 filed by Steeda Autosports, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Defendant UPR Product Inc., #3 Summons Summons for Joseph Mainiero, #4 Required Form Report of Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(BINGHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC v UPR PRODUCTS INC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPR Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mainiero
Represented By: John W Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPR PRODUCTS INC
Represented By: John W Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steeda Autosports, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM SHAWN BINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEEDA AUTOSPORTS LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM SHAWN BINGHAM
Represented By: EDWARD F PRESTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?