RICHARDSON et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: SEANESSE RICHARDSON and WILLIAM RICHARDSON
Defendant: KIMBERLY RICHARDSON, DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG, JOHN DOE, CHRYSLER LLC, FCA US LLC and CHRYSLER GROUP LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00015
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Leave of Absence (BOORMAN, MICHAEL)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #9 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 09:30 AM in Valdosta before US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON. (nop)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by FCA US LLC re #9 MOTION to Remand (BOORMAN, MICHAEL)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 3/4/19. (sbd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings by FCA US LLC filed by PHILIP HENDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(HENDERSON, PHILIP)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by SEANESSE RICHARDSON, WILLIAM RICHARDSON filed by CALEB H DIDRIKSEN, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amending Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit Incident Report)(DIDRIKSEN, CALEB)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KIMBERLY RICHARDSON (SMITH, JAY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Petition by KIMBERLY RICHARDSON with Jury Demand. Related document: #6 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by WILLIAM RICHARDSON, SEANESSE RICHARDSON.(SMITH, JAY)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal,, against All Defendants by WILLIAM RICHARDSON, SEANESSE RICHARDSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint for Damages)(DIDRIKSEN, CALEB)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by CARL A WOODS, III, CALEB H DIDRIKSEN, III (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission) (nop)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by FCA US LLC (BOORMAN, MICHAEL)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC (BOORMAN, MICHAEL)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL CARL A WOODS, III, CALEB H DIDRIKSEN, III - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd)
January 23, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by FCA US LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Also, the jurisdiction statement needs to filed as a separate document. (sbd)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FCA US LLC. (sbd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3068289, $400 filed by FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C - MTA Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Sale Order, #5 Exhibit E - MTA Am. No. 4, #6 Exhibit F - Stipulation & Order re MTA AM. No. 4, #7 Exhibit G - FCA Business Filing, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Jurisdictional Statement)(BOORMAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEANESSE RICHARDSON
Represented By: CALEB H DIDRIKSEN, III
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER B NEWBERN
Represented By: CARL A WOODS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM RICHARDSON
Represented By: CALEB H DIDRIKSEN, III
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER B NEWBERN
Represented By: CARL A WOODS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY RICHARDSON
Represented By: JAY HOLDER SMITH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: PHILIP HENDERSON
Represented By: MICHAEL R BOORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?