TOM HUSSEY v. DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: TOM HUSSEY
Defendant: DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00044
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Data Software Services, LLC dba ELEAD1ONE. (BAUGH, CHRISTINA)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default by DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC filed by CHRISTINA M BAUGH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of James Kinzer, #3 Exhibit 1 - DSS Member Consent, #4 Exhibit 2 - Data Software Services L.L.C.-GA-Change of Agent, #5 Exhibit 3 Data Software 01-18-19 SOS Filing- Ex 3.pdf)(BAUGH, CHRISTINA)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTINA M BAUGH on behalf of DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC Attorney CHRISTINA M BAUGH added to party DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC(pty:dft) (BAUGH, CHRISTINA)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by TOM HUSSEY re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Data Software Services, LLC dba ELEAD1ONE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Invoice)(ROTHMAN, JOEL)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by TOM HUSSEY re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Data Software Services, LLC dba ELEAD1ONE. (ROTHMAN, JOEL)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Data Software Services, LLC dba ELEAD1ONE. by TOM HUSSEY filed by JOEL BENJAMIN ROTHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Final Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Permanent Injunction)(ROTHMAN, JOEL)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Final Default. Plaintiff has until June 3, 2019 in which to file his Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/14/2019. (rlw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Final Default. by TOM HUSSEY filed by JOEL BENJAMIN ROTHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ROTHMAN, JOEL)
April 22, 2019 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (sbd)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman)(ROTHMAN, JOEL)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOM HUSSEY as to DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC. (ROTHMAN, JOEL)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 AO121, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington DC. (rlw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to TOM HUSSEY (rlw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Data Software Services, LLC (rlw) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (rlw).
March 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by TOM HUSSEY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (rlw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Data Software Services, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3108516, $400 filed by Tom Hussey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Required Form Form AO121)(ROTHMAN, JOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOM HUSSEY v. DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DATA SOFTWARE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: CHRISTINA M BAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM HUSSEY
Represented By: JOEL BENJAMIN ROTHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?