MAREE ET AL V RICHARDSON ET AL

Plaintiff: Sheba Maree and Jeff Spiva
Defendant: James Lee Roy Igou, Wallace L. Richardson, UNIT MANAGER DON BLAKELY, Sgt. WALLACE L RICHARDSON, Warden DON BLAKELY and CO JAMES LEE ROY IGOU
Case Number: 7:2019cv00046
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response filed by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition : (TORENO, VINCENT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response filed by WALLACE L RICHARDSON re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (HENEFELD, PAUL)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT hearing for 8/6/2019 02:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. (jbk)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #12 #24 Motions to Stay Discovery. Discovery in this case is hereby STAYED pending the resolution of Defendants' motions to dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/2/2019 (rlw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST for Oral Argument filed by SHEBA MAREE, JEFF SPIVA re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition :, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #24 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiffs Complaint for failure to state a claim, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition : (JONES, CRAIG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by SHEBA MAREE, JEFF SPIVA re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition :, #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #24 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiffs Complaint for failure to state a claim, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint :, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition : (JONES, CRAIG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 SECOND MOTION to Stay Discovery by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU filed by VINCENT A TORENO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(TORENO, VINCENT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition : by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU filed by VINCENT A TORENO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support Of MTD)(TORENO, VINCENT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition : by DON BLAKELY filed by Annarita L McGovern. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support)(McGovern, Annarita)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss #19 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by WALLACE L RICHARDSON filed by PAUL A HENEFELD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief of Support of Motion to Dismiss)(HENEFELD, PAUL) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (rlw).
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint/Petition by DON BLAKELY with Jury Demand. Related document: #19 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by JEFF SPIVA, SHEBA MAREE.(McGovern, Annarita)
June 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #19 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by JEFF SPIVA, SHEBA MAREE ); All documents must include a description of exhibit(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. No need to refile; docket entry has been corrected by case administrator. (rlw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by SHEBA MAREE, JEFF SPIVA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Georgia Bureau of Investigation Assistance Rendered Report)(JONES, CRAIG) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (rlw).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs must respond to the pending motions to dismiss and motion to stay (Docs. 11, 12, 13) no later than Monday, July 1, 2019.The discovery conference set for Tuesday, June 11, 2019 is CANCELLED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/4/2019. (rlw)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney RONALD J STAY terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/3/2019. (rlw)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed scheduling order, respond to motions and conduct case management conference. by SHEBA MAREE, JEFF SPIVA filed by CRAIG T JONES.(JONES, CRAIG)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DON BLAKELY, JAMES LEE ROY IGOU, WALLACE L RICHARDSON filed by RONALD J STAY.(STAY, RONALD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAUL A HENEFELD on behalf of WALLACE L RICHARDSON (HENEFELD, PAUL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : by WALLACE L RICHARDSON filed by PAUL A HENEFELD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(HENEFELD, PAUL)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU ); Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1.4, an attorney appearing of record in any action pending in this district, who wishes to withdraw as counsel for any party therein, shall submit a written motion for an order of court permitting such withdrawal. A Motion to Withdraw As Attorney by Ron Stay for Defendant Igou must be filed. (sbd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU filed by VINCENT A TORENO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(TORENO, VINCENT)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiffs Complaint for failure to state a claim by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU filed by VINCENT A TORENO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion)(TORENO, VINCENT)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by VINCENT A TORENO on behalf of JAMES LEE ROY IGOU Attorney VINCENT A TORENO added to party JAMES LEE ROY IGOU(pty:dft) (TORENO, VINCENT)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by DON BLAKELY with Jury Demand.(McGovern, Annarita)Attorney Annarita L McGovern added to party DON BLAKELY(pty:dft)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES LEE ROY IGOU. as to JAMES LEE ROY IGOU (STAY, RONALD)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RONALD J STAY on behalf of JAMES LEE ROY IGOU Attorney RONALD J STAY added to party JAMES LEE ROY IGOU(pty:dft) (STAY, RONALD)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/25/19. (jbk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DON BLAKELY. as to DON BLAKELY (STAY, RONALD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALLACE L RICHARDSON. as to WALLACE L RICHARDSON (STAY, RONALD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RONALD J STAY on behalf of DON BLAKELY, WALLACE L RICHARDSON Attorney RONALD J STAY added to party DON BLAKELY(pty:dft), Attorney RONALD J STAY added to party WALLACE L RICHARDSON(pty:dft) (STAY, RONALD)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SHEBA MAREE, JEFF SPIVA (rlw)
March 21, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by JEFF SPIVA, SHEBA MAREE ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (rlw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3110948, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JONES, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAREE ET AL V RICHARDSON ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lee Roy Igou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace L. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER DON BLAKELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. WALLACE L RICHARDSON
Represented By: RONALD J STAY
Represented By: PAUL A HENEFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden DON BLAKELY
Represented By: TERRY LYNN LONG
Represented By: RONALD J STAY
Represented By: Annarita L McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO JAMES LEE ROY IGOU
Represented By: ALAIN PAUL FERNANDEZ
Represented By: RONALD J STAY
Represented By: VINCENT A TORENO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheba Maree
Represented By: CRAIG T JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Spiva
Represented By: CRAIG T JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?