KENNETH RUMPH v. JONES SEPTIC TANK INC et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH RUMPH, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated and KENNETH RUMPH
Defendant: JONES SEPTIC TANK, INC., RODERICK B. JONES and RODERICK H. JONES, RODERICK H JONES, JONES SEPTIC TANK INC and RODERICK B JONES
Case Number: 7:2019cv00085
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from U.S. District Judge Hugh Lawson regarding Scheduling and Discovery Deadlines re #16 Scheduling/Discovery Order. (nop)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 1/28/2020. Dispositive motions due by 2/27/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 8/7/2019. (nop)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT JONES SEPTIC TANK, INC.s COUNTERCLAIMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by KENNETH RUMPH filed by ANDREW R FRISCH.(FRISCH, ANDREW)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Counterclaim. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant Jones Septic Tank, Inc.'s Counterclaim is extended through August 5, 2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 7/30/2019. (aks)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM. by KENNETH RUMPH filed by ANDREW R FRISCH.(FRISCH, ANDREW)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Consent to Join Action (FLSA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(FRISCH, ANDREW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENNETH RUMPH (FRISCH, ANDREW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RODERICK B JONES, JONES SEPTIC TANK INC (SEWELL, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR on behalf of RODERICK B JONES, JONES SEPTIC TANK INC Attorney MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR added to party RODERICK B JONES(pty:dft), Attorney MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR added to party JONES SEPTIC TANK INC(pty:cc), Attorney MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR added to party JONES SEPTIC TANK INC(pty:dft) (SEWELL, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/8/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(nop)
July 9, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, filed by RODERICK H JONES, JONES SEPTIC TANK INC, RODERICK B JONES ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (sbd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint(), COUNTERCLAIM against KENNETH RUMPH by RODERICK H JONES, RODERICK B JONES, JONES SEPTIC TANK INC with Jury Demand.(ROLLINS, RALEIGH)Attorney RALEIGH ROLLINS added to party RODERICK B JONES(pty:dft), Attorney RALEIGH ROLLINS added to party JONES SEPTIC TANK INC(pty:dft)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to Join Action (FLSA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(FRISCH, ANDREW)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KENNETH RUMPH. (sbd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RODERICK B JONES. (sbd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RODERICK H JONES. (sbd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JONES SEPTIC TANK INC. (sbd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JONES SEPTIC TANK, INC., RODERICK B. JONES and RODERICK H. JONES Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3183334, $400 filed by KENNETH RUMPH, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Corp. Summons, #3 Summons Individual Summons, #4 Summons Individual Summons)(FRISCH, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNETH RUMPH v. JONES SEPTIC TANK INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES SEPTIC TANK, INC., RODERICK B. JONES and RODERICK H. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODERICK H JONES
Represented By: ROBERT D HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES SEPTIC TANK INC
Represented By: MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR
Represented By: RALEIGH ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODERICK B JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR
Represented By: RALEIGH ROLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH RUMPH, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated
Represented By: ANDREW R FRISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH RUMPH
Represented By: ANDREW R FRISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?