DAVIS v. COLLINS et al
Plaintiff: LIN E DAVIS
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT, ANDREW COLLINS and MICHELLE THURMAN
Case Number: 7:2019cv00129
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's successor or representative must move for substitution and serve Defendants by not later than December 15, 2019. In the absence of a motion for substitution, this case will be dismissed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 10/3/2019. (aks)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION in Support to Have Case Go Forward filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Pages from the Jailhouse Lawyer's Handbook, #2 Envelope)(sbd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order from Retaliation Filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order from Retaliation Filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Subpeona Court Records filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Subpoena, #2 Envelope)(sbd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Freeze Access and Accounts of the Defendants filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Restraining Order and Injunction filed by LIN E DAVIS.(sbd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LIN E DAVIS. (sbd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW COLLINS, MICHELLE THURMAN, UNKNOWN DEFENDANT, filed by LIN E DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. COLLINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIN E DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE THURMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?