MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ et al v. IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER et al
Plaintiff: BRYAN JORDAN and MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES and UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00136
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT dismissing the case. (sbd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal and denying as moot without prejudice #9 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/16/19. (sbd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ, BRYAN JORDAN as to ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) (BANIAS, BRADLEY)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Morris, Deportation Officer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Caitlin Wegrzyn, Field Office Director, Charleston Field Office, #3 Exhibit 3 - Form I-130, #4 Exhibit 4 - Blandon Sanchez Ticket and Incident Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Blandon Sanchez SC Bond Documents). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BRADLEY B BANIAS (nop)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-30-19. (jdl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bond Hearing Notice 6-10-19, IJ Bond Order, #2 Exhibit B - Petitioner's Motion for Continuance and I-130 Filing Receipt) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bond Hearing Notice 6-10-19, IJ Bond Order, #2 Exhibit B - Petitioner's Motion for Continuance and I-130 Filing Receipt)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3245121, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ, BRYAN JORDAN. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-23-19. (jdl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BRYAN JORDAN, MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ. (sbd)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd)
August 23, 2019 US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS added. US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND no longer assigned to case. (sbd)
August 23, 2019 Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer to Case # 7:19cv136 (tlp)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3244405, $5 filed by MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ, BRYAN JORDAN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Irwin County Detention Center, #3 Summons ICE, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO, #6 Summons USCIS)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ et al v. IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN JORDAN
Represented By: BRADLEY B BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE JOHANNA BLANDON SANCHEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY B BANIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRWIN COUNTY DETENTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?